Brown v. The People of the State of New York et al
Plaintiff: Thurman Jerome Brown
Defendant: The Nassau County Unified Court System, The Nassau County Police Department, The County of Nassau, The People of the State of New York and The Nassau County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv00020
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
2 Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - The Court finds that plaintiff can best set forth his current financial position on the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)" (AO239). Accordingly, plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice and with leave to renew upon filing the enclosed "Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)" (AO239). Alternatively, plaintiff may pay the $400.00 filing fee. Plaintiff shall either file the Long Form or remit the filing fee within 2 weeks of the date of this Order or this action will be dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se plaintiff. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/21/2020. (Tirado, Chelsea)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori L. Pack on behalf of The Nassau County Unified Court System (aty to be noticed) (Pack, Lori)
January 31, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown. Judge Joanna Seybert no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Russo, Eric)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Thurman Jerome Brown. (Valle, Christine)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 1/8/2020 Re: THIS LETTER ACKNOWLEDGES RECEIPT OF YOUR CIVIL ACTION(S). DOCKET NUMBER(S) AND JUDGE(S) HAVE BEEN ASSIGNED AS INDICATED ABOVE. (Valle, Christine)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Related Cases: 06-cv-2502-JS-AKT, 06-cv-5134-JS-AKT, 07-cv-1809-JS, 08-cv-0026-JS-AKT, 08-cv-0198-JS-AKT, 08-cv-0343-JS-AKT and 08-cv-2164-JS (Cox, Dwayne)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thurman Jerome Brown. (Cox, Dwayne)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Thurman Jerome Brown. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Appendix I, #10 Appendix J, #11 Appendix K, #12 Appendix L, #13 Appendix M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. The People of the State of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman Jerome Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nassau County Unified Court System
Represented By: Lori L. Pack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nassau County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Nassau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nassau County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?