Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach School UFSD et al
Plaintiff: Terrie Killoran and Christian Killoran
Defendant: Joyce Donneson, Westhampton Beach School UFSD, Michael Raddy, Suzanne Mensch, Halsey Stevens and Mary Ann Ambrosini
Case Number: 2:2020cv00269
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service Re: Civil Cover Sheet and Verified Complaint served on Devitt Spellman Barrett, LLP on 1/16/2020, filed by Christian Killoran. (Valle, Christine)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 1/17/2020 Re: THIS LETTER ACKNOWLEDGES RECEIPT OF YOUR CIVIL ACTION(S). DOCKET NUMBER(S) AND JUDGE(S) HAVE BEEN ASSIGNED AS INDICATED ABOVE. (Valle, Christine)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-JS-SIL, 17-cv-3553-ADS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL and 19-cv-6663-JS-SIL (Cox, Dwayne)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Terrie Killoran, Christian Killoran, Christian Killoran(on behalf of his son AK). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)
January 16, 2020 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 29154 (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach School UFSD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Donneson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westhampton Beach School UFSD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Raddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Mensch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halsey Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Ambrosini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?