Benson v. Ruttura et. al.
Plaintiff: William Benson
Defendant: Our Rental Corp., Thomas Ruttura and Ruttura & Sons Construction Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00853
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for filing motion to dismiss filed by William Benson. (Graff, Ariel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for filing motion to dismiss by Our Rental Corp., Thomas Ruttura, Ruttura & Sons Construction Co., Inc.. (Camhi, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2020 The 2/28/2020 Quality Control Check re Summons was deleted from the above-referenced case as it was docketed in the incorrect case number. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to March 27, 2020 to Answer for All Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/27/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes Colwin on behalf of Our Rental Corp., Thomas Ruttura, Ruttura & Sons Construction Co., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Colwin, Mercedes)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Our Rental Corp., Thomas Ruttura, Ruttura & Sons Construction Co., Inc.. (Camhi, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Benson. Our Rental Corp. served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020; Thomas Ruttura served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020; Ruttura & Sons Construction Co., Inc. served on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (Graff, Ariel)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Our Rental Corp., Thomas Ruttura, Ruttura & Sons Construction Co., Inc.. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
February 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Our Rental Corp., Thomas Ruttura, Ruttura & Sons Construction Co., Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12401613 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by William Benson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Ruttura & Sons Construction Co., Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Our Rental Corp., #4 Proposed Summons Thomas Ruttura) (Graff, Ariel) Modified on 2/18/2020 (Vanderbilt, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Ruttura et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Benson
Represented By: Ariel Yigal Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Our Rental Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Camhi
Represented By: Mercedes Colwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ruttura
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Camhi
Represented By: Mercedes Colwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruttura & Sons Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Camhi
Represented By: Mercedes Colwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?