United States of America v. Precision Consulting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Precision Consulting, Inc. and Wayne Gladney
Case Number: 2:2020cv01794
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. A telephone status conference was held on June 10, 2020. Attorney Shana Priore appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Defendant Wayne Gladney appeared on his own behalf pro se. The Court informed Mr. Gladney that Defendant Precision Consulting, Inc., may only appear through licensed counsel, and that he may not represent the company. Mr. Gladney was also informed that if Precision Consulting does not retain counsel, it may be found in default, meaning that all of Plaintiff's allegations against it will be deemed admitted.The parties discussed the document requests and interrogatories that Plaintiff sent to Mr. Gladney. The Court explained that Mr. Gladney must respond to the interrogatory questions truthfully and to the best of his ability and that Mr. Gladney must turn over all documents responsive to Plaintiff's requests that are in his possession or control. If Mr. Gladney has any questions about Plaintiff's discovery requests, he should speak to Ms. Priore. Mr. Gladney must respond to Plainitff's discovery requests by June 22, 2020. If Mr. Gladney has any documents requests or interrogatories to be served on Plaintiff, he must send or email them to Plaintiff by June 22, 2020.The parties also discussed the allegations in the Complaint and Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. Plaintiff is directed to send copies of the Complaint and the motion to Mr. Gladney via email. Mr. Gladney is directed to answer the Complaint and respond to the preliminary injunction motion by June 22, 2020.Plaintiff's counsel is directed to send a copy of this Minute Entry to Mr. Gladney, along with the telephone number and access code for the evidentiary hearing on July 7, 2020 before Judge Dearie. (FTR Log #10:04-10:21am.)(Rand, Matthew)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Raymond J. Dearie. Parties are directed to call toll free number 888-684-8852 access code: 3850449. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 5/27/2020. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT to the Honorable Raymond J. Dearie by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Priore, Shana)
May 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held on 5/15/2020. Attorney Shana Priore appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Stuart Keith and Demian Ellis of the Environmental Protection Agency were also present. No appearance on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff's counsel informed the Court that she had previous contact with defendant Wayne Gladney and that Mr. Gladney was made aware of the initial conference. The #9 Letter request for expedited discovery is so-ordered. The deadline for Plaintiff to serve document requests and interrogatories on Mr. Gladney is May 22, 2020. The deadline for Defendant Gladney to respond to the document requests and interrogatories is June 22, 2020.A Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for June 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. If Defendant Gladney continues not to be represented by counsel, he must personally participate in the telephone conference. At that time, he will be informed of his obligations in this litigation. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to send a copy of this Minute Entry to Defendants and inform them of the new conference date.(FTR Log: 11:09 11:18)(O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 Letter regarding status of case and proposing expedited discovery schedule by United States of America (Priore, Shana) Modified on 5/15/2020 to reflect this is a motion (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan).
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Wayne Gladney served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (Priore, Shana)
April 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held on 4/29/2020. Attorney Shana Priore appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Stuart Keith and Demian Ellis of the Environmental Protection Agency were also present. No appearance behalf of defendants. Plaintiffs counsel informed the Court that defendant Gladney was served in the last one or two days, and that an affidavit of service will be filed on the docket. The Initial Conference is rescheduled to May 15, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. Plaintiff is directed to send a copy of this Minute Entry and Order to Defendants and inform them of the new conference date. Defendant Precision Consulting, Inc. is advised through this order that a corporation may not appear in this Court except through licensed counsel; failure to appear through counsel may result in default being entered against a corporate entity. Defendant Wayne Gladney may represent himself or appear through counsel. (FTR Log 10:39-10:46) (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on April 29, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the access code 1453850 at the time of the conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected.Counsel must be fully prepared to discuss deadlines for discovery as outlined in a Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to ensure that defendants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/15/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #5 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. The Court orders expedited discovery under the supervision of Magistrate Judge Kuo. The parties are directed to file a status report with the Court thirty days from the date that service is effectuated. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 4/14/2020. (Bakst, Laura)
April 14, 2020 Case Randomly Reassigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Judge Joan M. Azrack, Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to the case. (See Doc. Number 6 for correct civil cover sheet.) Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Brown, Marc)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by United States of America (Priore, Shana)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Demian Ellis) (Priore, Shana) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2020: #2 Notice of Motion) (Mahoney, Brenna).
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wayne Gladney, Precision Consulting, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Priore, Shana) Modified on 4/14/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Precision Consulting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Gladney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Shana C. Priore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?