Bellinger v. Fludd et al
Plaintiff: Leonis Bellinger
Defendant: Jane Doe, NU Health Department, John Doe, Vera Fludd, Nassau County Correctional Facility and Inmate Grievance Dept.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02206
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 Letter dated 7/7/2020 from Douglas C. Palmer to The Warden regarding the Prisoner Authorization. (C/mailed). (Ramesar, Thameera)
July 4, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Authorization filed by Leonis Bellinger. (Ramesar, Thameera)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. (C/mailed) (Ramesar, Thameera)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03605. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 14, 2020 Mailed a copy of #4 Transfer Order, to Leonis Bellinger, DIN No. 19A4424; Moriah Shock Incarceration Correctional, P.O. Box 901, Mineville, NY 12956. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/18/2020.]
May 8, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/18/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/8/2020) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/18/2020.]
May 8, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/18/2020.]
May 7, 2020 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis see document #1 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Leonis Bellinger. (Cox, Dwayne)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Leonis Bellinger. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/18/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe(Correctional Officer, evening shift E2E), Jane Doe(Correctional Officer, afternoon shift E2E), Jane Doe(Correctional Officer, morning shift), Jane Doe(Correctional Officer, night shit), Jane Doe(Correctional Officer, morning shift E2E), Jane Doe(Correctional Officer, night shift E2E), Jane Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe, John Doe(Correctional Officer, night shift E2E), John Doe, John Doe(Correctional Officer, afternoon shift E2E), John Doe(Correctional Officer, night shit), John Doe(Correctional Officer, afternoon shift), John Doe(Correctional Officer, morning shift E2E), John Doe(Correctional Officer, evening shift E2E), Vera Fludd, Inmate Grievance Dept., NU Health Department, Nassau County Correctional Facility. Document filed by Leonis Bellinger..(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/18/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Leonis Bellinger. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/18/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellinger v. Fludd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera Fludd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Grievance Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonis Bellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?