Town of Poughkeepsie v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Town of Poughkeepsie
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Anda, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Kinray, LLC, AmerisouceBergen Drug Corporation, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Helath Solutions Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., John N. Kapoor, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. dba Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. nka Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Noramco, Inc., Walmart Stores East, LP, Rite Aid Corp., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc. (f, Endo Health Solutions Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02431
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL Reply Declaration of Robert Kirshenberg, REPLY in Support filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - City Orlando Order, #2 Exhibit B - The Board of County Commissioners Order) (Kirshenberg, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer To National Opioid MDL filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit) (Badala, Salvatore)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore C. Badala on behalf of Town of Poughkeepsie (aty to be noticed) (Badala, Salvatore)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 Memorandum in Opposition, #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Replacing Incorrect PDF file filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt City of Buffalo Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt ToP Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - MDL Statement of Interest) (Kirshenberg, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL filed by Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt City of Buffalo Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt ToP Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - MDL Statement of Interest) (Kirshenberg, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to National Opioid MDL by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Kirshenberg, Robert)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall adhere to the briefing schedule set out in the Court's June 24, 2020 order concerning the motion to remand. The Court waives the pre-motion conference requirement for Defendants' proposed motion seeking a stay. Defendants shall file their motion to stay concurrently with Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to stay within one week of the filing of Defendants' motion and Defendants shall file a reply, if any, one week after Plaintiff files its response to the motion to stay. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/8/2020. (Terranova, Robert)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 Letter in Opposition of Sandoz Inc's pre-motion conference request by Town of Poughkeepsie (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL Order Regarding Remand) (Napoli, Paul)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Town of Poughkeepsie. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Town of Poughkeepsie Complaint, #4 Exhibit Court Notice of Transfer, #5 Exhibit Sandoz Inc. Notice of Removal) (Napoli, Paul)
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 Letter Joint Letter requesting pre-motion conference by Sandoz, Inc. (Kirshenberg, Robert)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court's pre-motion conference requirement is waived. Defendants shall file their opposition to the motion to remand two weeks after Plaintiff files the motion to remand. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed one week after Defendants file their opposition papers. The Court's "bundling" rule concerning the service and filing of motions does not apply to the motion to remand. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/24/2020. (Terranova, Robert)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Pre Motion Conference by Town of Poughkeepsie (Napoli, Paul) Modified event type from Letter to Motion on 6/18/2020 (Ortiz, Grisel).
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD Received from Supreme Court, Suffolk County, 400002/2020; containing certified copy of clerk's minutes and notice of removal. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Actavis LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Consent to Removal (Holly, Pamela)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED until sixty (60) days following the later of: (1) the Court's ruling on a motion to remand (if any such motion), or (2) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the multidistrict litigation for opioid-related actions (the Opiate MDL). Counsel are directed to submit a letter advising this Court within three (3) days of either of the above decisions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/5/2020. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, and To Conduct 26(f) Conference for 60 Days by Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Extending Time To Answer, Move Or Respond to Complaint and To Conduct 26(f) Conference for 60 Days) (Kirshenberg, Robert)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for additional corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Sandoz, Inc. (Kirshenberg, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Sica, Michele)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sandoz, Inc. from Supeme Court, Suffolk County, case number 400002/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12867635) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Fee Waiver Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Entry & Order, #5 Exhibit E - Notice to County Clerk-CPLR Section 8019(c), #6 Exhibit F - Dutchess County Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit G - Court Notice re Transfer to Suffolk County, #8 Exhibit H - Suffolk County Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirshenberg, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Poughkeepsie v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Shailee Diwanji Sharma
Represented By: Alexander Setzepfandt
Represented By: Christopher Yuk Lun Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Esther Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Kirshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Pamela C. Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinray, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisouceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Paul Edward Asfendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Gardner Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Kaspar Johannes Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Helath Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Represented By: Kurt Michael Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar Johannes Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: James M. Wicks
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mulry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Devon Wayne Galloway
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. dba Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Marc Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Represented By: Kaspar Johannes Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Nathaniel Owen Asher
Represented By: Vincent J. Messina, Jr.
Represented By: Ross Bradley Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Ferruggia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Owen Asher
Represented By: Vincent J. Messina, Jr.
Represented By: Ross Bradley Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. nka Hikma Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moore
Represented By: Carolyn Anne Silane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Owen Asher
Represented By: Vincent J. Messina, Jr.
Represented By: Ross Bradley Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Owen Asher
Represented By: Vincent J. Messina, Jr.
Represented By: Ross Bradley Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc. (f
Represented By: Jennifer Gardner Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: James Herschlein
Represented By: Julie Bauman Du Pont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Michael T. Ferruggia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moore
Represented By: Carolyn Anne Silane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Poughkeepsie
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?