Engelberg v. Perr et al
Plaintiff: Michael Engelberg
Defendant: Jedidiah Perr, The New York Center for Civil Justice, Tolerance & Values, Inc., Milton Pollack, Eliezer Perr, The American Center for Civil Justice, Religious Liberty and Tolerance, Inc., The American Center for Civil Justice, Inc. and The New York Center for Civil Justice, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02635
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 3:20-cv-08193, filed 07/02/2020. (Cubano, Jazmin)
June 30, 2020 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Cubano, Jazmin)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs letter #4 requesting that this case be transferred to the District of New Jersey based on an order of the Bankruptcy Court in that district. There being no objection to the transfer of this case, the case is hereby transferred to the District of New Jersey for reference to the Bankruptcy Court. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 6/30/2020. (Hoon, Megha)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 Letter by The American Center for Civil Justice, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Sher, Neal)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Letter of no objection to transfer by The New York Center for Civil Justice, Inc. (Luz, Thomas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Judge Hurley advising no objection to transfer of case to NJ Bankruptcy Court by Jedidiah Perr, The American Center for Civil Justice, Religious Liberty and Tolerance, Inc. (Gartner, Kenneth)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #4 : Defendants are directed to respond to Plaintiff's letter, specifically whether they have any objection to transferring this case to New Jersey, by June 26, 2020. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 6/22/2020. (Hoon, Megha)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Letter regarding transfer of case to U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey by Michael Engelberg (Berkoff, Leslie)
June 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on All Defendants on June 12, 2020, filed by Michael Engelberg. (Berkoff, Leslie)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Engelberg from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Nassau County, case number 606919/2014. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12921888)Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Verified Answer and Counterclaims, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Verified_Derivative Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Docket as of May 31, 2020, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Berkoff, Leslie) Modified on 6/15/2020 (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engelberg v. Perr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Engelberg
Represented By: Leslie Ann Berkoff
Represented By: David D. Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jedidiah Perr
Represented By: Joseph Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York Center for Civil Justice, Tolerance & Values, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Pollack
Represented By: Efrem Tobias Schwalb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliezer Perr
Represented By: Efrem Tobias Schwalb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Center for Civil Justice, Religious Liberty and Tolerance, Inc.
Represented By: Neal Matthew Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Center for Civil Justice, Inc.
Represented By: Neal Matthew Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York Center for Civil Justice, Inc.
Represented By: Neal Matthew Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?