Connelly et. al. v. P.C. Richard & Son Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Andrew Serrao, Jeffrey Connelly and Joseph Lapuma
Defendant: P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp., P.C. Richard & Son Inc. and P.C. Richard & Son, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03091
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for for Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint by September 14, 2020 and for Extension of Time to Answer by Defendants until October 15, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/1/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Operative Complaint, and Setting Deadline for Plaintiffs to file Amended Complaint by P.C. Richard & Son Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, LLC, P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp.. (Graham, Glenn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: P.C. Richard & Son Inc. answer due 9/3/2020; P.C. Richard & Son, LLC answer due 9/3/2020; P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp. answer due 9/3/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/17/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by P.C. Richard & Son Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, LLC, P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp.. (Graham, Glenn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Connelly, Andrew Serrao, Joseph Lapuma. P.C. Richard & Son Inc. served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020; P.C. Richard & Son, LLC served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020; P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp. served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Avallone, Rocco)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn T. Graham on behalf of P.C. Richard & Son Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, LLC, P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Graham, Glenn)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Gyves on behalf of P.C. Richard & Son Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, LLC, P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Gyves, William)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to P.C. Richard & Son Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, LLC, P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp.. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
July 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against P.C. Richard & Son Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, LLC, P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13048859 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No. filed by Jeffrey Connelly, Andrew Serrao, Joseph Lapuma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Avallone, Rocco) Modified on 7/13/2020 (Vanderbilt, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connelly et. al. v. P.C. Richard & Son Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Serrao
Represented By: Rocco G. Avallone
Represented By: Christopher F. Bellistri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Connelly
Represented By: Rocco G. Avallone
Represented By: Christopher F. Bellistri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lapuma
Represented By: Rocco G. Avallone
Represented By: Christopher F. Bellistri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.C.Richard & Son, L.I. Corp.
Represented By: William S. Gyves
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.C. Richard & Son Inc.
Represented By: William S. Gyves
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.C. Richard & Son, LLC
Represented By: William S. Gyves
Represented By: Glenn T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?