Solomon v. St. Joseph Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Solomon
Defendant: St. Joseph Hospital and Catholic Health Services of Long Island, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03213
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
2 Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: The pre-motion conference scheduled for September 23, 2020 is being adjourned by the Court to October 27, 2020 @ 3:00 PM due to a conflict with the Court's calendar and the ongoing health crisis with COVID-19. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. (Innelli, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles K Faillace on behalf of Catholic Health Services of Long Island, Inc., St. Joseph Hospital (aty to be noticed) (Faillace, Charles)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's letter application #6 dated 7/24/20 is GRANTED. A pre motion conference is scheduled on September 23, 2026 @ 3:00PM. There will be no formal notice mailed to counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this conference and then file a letter application.Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/24/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY in Opposition , RESPONSE to Motion re #6 First MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Notice of Removal, First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with Supreme Court Summons & Complaint attached filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gardy, Craig)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Notice of Removal, , First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with Supreme Court Summons & Complaint attached by Catholic Health Services of Long Island, Inc., St. Joseph Hospital. (Braverman, Dylan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: it is requested that the Clerk of the Court reassign this matter to a randomly selected Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 7/21/2020. (Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for all further proceedings.) (Florio, Lisa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
July 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
July 17, 2020 Wrong docketing event used to pay the filing fee. Deleted and re-entered using Filing Fee Received. (Landow, Concetta)
July 17, 2020 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-13080895 (Landow, Concetta)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Landow, Concetta)
July 17, 2020 The case of Solomon v. St. Joseph Hospital et al, has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 20cv3213. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days. Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Landow, Concetta)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #1 Notice of Removal service on plaintiff by Catholic Health Services of Long Island, Inc., St. Joseph Hospital (Braverman, Dylan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Catholic Health Services of Long Island, Inc., St. Joseph Hospital from Supreme Court Nassau County, case number 605684/2020.Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13080895) (Braverman, Dylan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/17/2020) (Landow, Concetta). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. St. Joseph Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Hospital
Represented By: Dylan C. Braverman
Represented By: Charles K Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Services of Long Island, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan C. Braverman
Represented By: Charles K Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Solomon
Represented By: Joseph David Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?