Gambino, DC et. al. v. Village of Freeport, NY et. al.
Plaintiff: Major Coinage Holdings, Inc. and Joseph R. Gambino, DC
Defendant: Joseph Madigan, Mark Davella, Village of Freeport, NY, Vilma Lancaster and Daniel Hinton
Case Number: 2:2020cv03216
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 The time for the defendant Village of Freeport to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including September 25, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/25/2020. c/ecf (Miller, Dina)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Village of Freeport, NY. (Tanzi, Stephanie)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Daniel Hinton, Vilma Lancaster, Joseph Madigan. (Murphy, James)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #17 : The time for Mark Davella to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including September 25, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/21/2020. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mark Davella. (Crowley, Adam)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Crowley on behalf of Mark Davella (aty to be noticed) (Crowley, Adam)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph R. Gambino, DC, Major Coinage Holdings, Inc.. Vilma Lancaster served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Nof, Eitan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph R. Gambino, DC, Major Coinage Holdings, Inc.. Mark Davella served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Nof, Eitan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph R. Gambino, DC, Major Coinage Holdings, Inc.. Daniel Hinton served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Nof, Eitan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph R. Gambino, DC, Major Coinage Holdings, Inc.. Joseph Madigan served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Nof, Eitan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph R. Gambino, DC, Major Coinage Holdings, Inc.. Village of Freeport, NY served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Nof, Eitan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Santora on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Santora, John)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Colton on behalf of Daniel Hinton, Vilma Lancaster, Joseph Madigan, Village of Freeport, NY (aty to be noticed) (Colton, Howard)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Mark Davella, Daniel Hinton, Vilma Lancaster, Joseph Madigan, Village of Freeport, NY. (Piper, Francine)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Joseph R. Gambino, DC, Major Coinage Holdings, Inc. (Nof, Eitan)
July 21, 2020 Your proposed summons was not issued for the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. No name and Address in Section for Plaintiffs Attorney. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Piper, Francine)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Ordered by Clerk of Court on 7/21/2020. (Marziliano, August)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Joseph R. Gambino, DC, Major Coinage Holdings, Inc. (Nof, Eitan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically for filing action by Joseph R. Gambino, DC, Major Coinage Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Receipts) (Nof, Eitan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13080678 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Joseph R. Gambino, DC and Major Coinage Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nof, Eitan) Modified on 7/17/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gambino, DC et. al. v. Village of Freeport, NY et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Madigan
Represented By: James M. Murphy
Represented By: Howard Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Davella
Represented By: Adam Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Freeport, NY
Represented By: Stephanie L Tanzi
Represented By: Howard Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vilma Lancaster
Represented By: James M. Murphy
Represented By: Howard Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hinton
Represented By: James M. Murphy
Represented By: Howard Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Coinage Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Eitan Nof
Represented By: John Santora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Gambino, DC
Represented By: Eitan Nof
Represented By: John Santora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?