Cirocco & Ozzimo, Inc. v. Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cirocco & Ozzimo, Inc.
Defendant: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv03219
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc. for Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Jon Kalik on behalf of Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the complaint is hereby extended to August 24, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/24/2020. (Jacobwitz, Beth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Beer, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
July 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for additional corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Allen Beer, Jr on behalf of Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Beer, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc. for Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13081349Was the Disclosure Statement completed on the Civil Cover Sheet?- Yes.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance) Modified on 7/17/2020 (Vanderbilt, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cirocco & Ozzimo, Inc. v. Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Beer, Jr.
Represented By: Lance Jon Kalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirocco & Ozzimo, Inc.
Represented By: Hal Edward Blanchard
Represented By: Michael S. Zetlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?