Tiger Capital Group v. American Heritage Billiards, LLC et. al.
Plaintiff: Tiger Capital Group
Defendant: Great Gatherings, American Heritage Billiards, LLC, Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Recreational Products, LLC and Great Gatherings Recreational Products, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Joseph Pucci and John K Lane
Counter Defendant: Menachem Sibler, K&M Recovery LLC, Supreme Capital Source, Toprock Funding, LLC, SPG Advance, LLC d/b/a Tiger Capital Group and Lazer Preizler
Case Number: 2:2020cv03440
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on November 16, 2020 before the undersigned in a Courtroom that counsel will be notified of upon entry to the courthouse. The conference will be held at the Central Islip Courthouse located at 100 Federal Plaza. Counsel for all parties must attend. The attached Discovery Plan Worksheet is to be completed by counsel and electronically filed with the Court by November 12th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/17/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Toprock Funding, LLC. (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Menachem Sibler. (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Lazer Preizler. (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to K&M Recovery LLC. (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons, #5 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by American Heritage Billiards, LLC, Great Gatherings Recreational Products, LLC, John K Lane, Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Joseph Pucci, Recreational Products, LLC (Heskin, Shane)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons, #5 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by American Heritage Billiards, LLC, Great Gatherings Recreational Products, LLC, John K Lane, Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Joseph Pucci, Recreational Products, LLC (Heskin, Shane)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons, #5 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by American Heritage Billiards, LLC, Great Gatherings Recreational Products, LLC, John K Lane, Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Joseph Pucci, Recreational Products, LLC (Heskin, Shane)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons, #5 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by American Heritage Billiards, LLC, Great Gatherings Recreational Products, LLC, John K Lane, Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Joseph Pucci, Recreational Products, LLC (Heskin, Shane)
September 11, 2020 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: Did not use the correct Summons form AO 441 Rev 7/10, SUMMONS ON A THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 11, 2020 An Answer with a Third Party Complaint and Counterclaims was filed incorrectly in this case. The entry has been deleted in its entirety. The Clerk of Court will make all corrections and re-file the Answer correctly with a *corrected* notation. The entry will bear the same document number as the original (DE #5 ). (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #5 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, by American Heritage Billiards, LLC, Great Gatherings, Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Joseph Pucci, Recreational Products, LLC (Heskin, Shane)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #5 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, by American Heritage Billiards, LLC, Great Gatherings, Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Joseph Pucci, Recreational Products, LLC (Heskin, Shane)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #5 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, by American Heritage Billiards, LLC, Great Gatherings, Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Joseph Pucci, Recreational Products, LLC (Heskin, Shane)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #5 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, by American Heritage Billiards, LLC, Great Gatherings, Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Joseph Pucci, Recreational Products, LLC (Heskin, Shane)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 *Corrected* ANSWER to Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Menachem Sibler, Toprock Funding, LLC, Lazer Preizler, Supreme Capital Source, SPG Advance, LLC, K&M Recovery LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Menachem Sibler, Toprock Funding, LLC, Lazer Preizler, Supreme Capital Source, SPG Advance, LLC, K&M Recovery LLC, John K Lane by Joseph Pucci, John K Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Tirado, Chelsea) Modified on 9/11/2020 (Tirado, Chelsea).
August 28, 2020 Counsel in this case contacted the Clerk's Office and informed that a Request for Certificate of Default was inadvertently filed on the docket. The entry has been deleted in its entirety. (Tirado, Chelsea)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Joseph Austin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Austin, David)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc, Joseph Pucci from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 606533/2020. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13139927) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Heskin, Shane) Modified on 7/31/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiger Capital Group v. American Heritage Billiards, LLC et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiger Capital Group
Represented By: David Joseph Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Gatherings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Heritage Billiards, LLC
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Holdings & Investments, Inc
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recreational Products, LLC
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Gatherings Recreational Products, LLC
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Joseph Pucci
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: John K Lane
Represented By: Shane R. Heskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Menachem Sibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: K&M Recovery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Supreme Capital Source
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Toprock Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SPG Advance, LLC d/b/a Tiger Capital Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lazer Preizler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?