Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. et al v. Chembio Diagnostics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P., Special Situations Private Equity Fund, L.P. and Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P.
Defendant: Dougherty & Company LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Richard L. Eberly, Chembio Diagnostics, Inc. and Gail S. Page
Case Number: 2:2020cv03753
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Davisson Cook on behalf of Dougherty & Company LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated (notification declined or already on case) (Cook, Jordan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Smith on behalf of Dougherty & Company LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated (notification declined or already on case) (Smith, Colleen)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D Johnson on behalf of Dougherty & Company LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated (notification declined or already on case) (Johnson, Michele)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorneys shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorneys shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/8/2020. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dougherty & Company LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Baird Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Baird Holding Company, Other Affiliate Baird Financial Group, Inc. for Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated; Corporate Parent Colliers International Group, Inc. for Dougherty & Company LLC. (McDonough, Kevin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13492806. by Dougherty & Company LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan D. Cook, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Cook, Jordan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13492722. by Dougherty & Company LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele D. Johnson, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Michele)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13492632. by Dougherty & Company LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colleen C. Smith, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Smith, Colleen)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. McDonough on behalf of Dougherty & Company LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated (aty to be noticed) (McDonough, Kevin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chembio Diagnostics, Inc. (Diakos, Joanna)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna A Diakos on behalf of Chembio Diagnostics, Inc., Richard L. Eberly, Gail S. Page (aty to be noticed) (Diakos, Joanna)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chembio Diagnostics, Inc., Dougherty & Company LLC, Richard L. Eberly, Gail S. Page, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13224074 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P., Special Situations Private Equity Fund, L.P., Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Randolph, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P. et al v. Chembio Diagnostics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Special Situations Fund III QP, L.P.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Steven M. Hecht
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Special Situations Private Equity Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Steven M. Hecht
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Special Situations Cayman Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Represented By: Steven M. Hecht
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dougherty & Company LLC
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: Jordan Davisson Cook
Represented By: Kevin M. McDonough
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Represented By: Jordan Davisson Cook
Represented By: Kevin M. McDonough
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Eberly
Represented By: Joanna A Diakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chembio Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna A Diakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail S. Page
Represented By: Joanna A Diakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?