MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp. et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Mehryar M. Sadeghi, MD, Optimum Health Physical Therapy, PC and MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp.
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv03805
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Schuyler Ufkes on behalf of MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp., Mehryar M. Sadeghi, MD, Optimum Health Physical Therapy, PC (notification declined or already on case) (Ufkes, Schuyler)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Michael, Charles)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Michael, Charles)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp., Optimum Health Physical Therapy, PC, Mehryar M. Sadeghi, MD. Twin City Fire Insurance Company served on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Ufkes, Schuyler)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp., Optimum Health Physical Therapy, PC, Mehryar M. Sadeghi, MD. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Ufkes, Schuyler)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to October 14, 2020 to Answer for All Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/18/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Michael, Charles)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having reviewed the Pro Hac Vice application #8 submitted by Schuyler Ufkes for Plaintiff Maia Salon Spa and Wellness and found it to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the application is approved. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notifications of activity in this case. The attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted or has been submitted to the Clerk's Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/11/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13350629. by MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp., Mehryar M. Sadeghi, MD, Optimum Health Physical Therapy, PC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Admission Information Certificate of Good Standing) (Ufkes, Schuyler)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optimum Health Physical Therapy, PC (Richman, Benjamin)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp. (Richman, Benjamin)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/22/2020 11:30 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Said conference will be conducted telephonically. At the designated time, the Parties shall call Chambers' teleconferencing number, (877) 336-1280 , and follow the automated instructions; the access code is: 7215690 . Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order upon defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 8/20/2020. c/ECF (Adell, April)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Twin City Fire Insurance Company filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13238177 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp., Optimum Health Physical Therapy, PC, Mehryar M. Sadeghi, MD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., #3 Proposed Summons to Twin City Fire Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F) (Richman, Benjamin) Modified on 8/20/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp. et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Charles A. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles A. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehryar M. Sadeghi, MD
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Represented By: Schuyler Ufkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optimum Health Physical Therapy, PC
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Represented By: Schuyler Ufkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAIA Salon Spa and Wellness Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Represented By: Schuyler Ufkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?