United States of America v. Eight-four thousand nine hundred sixty-three dollars and zero cents
Plaintiff: US Attorney's Office Eastern District of NY and United States of America
Defendant: Eighty-four thousand nine hundred sixty-three dollars and zero cents
Case Number: 2:2020cv03824
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Eighty-four thousand nine hundred sixty-three dollars and zero cents. (Cubano, Jazmin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Leonardo, Diane)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Leonardo, Diane)
October 8, 2020 Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on each summons does not match the caption of the complaint; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Cubano, Jazmin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Leonardo, Diane)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eighty-four thousand nine hundred sixty-three dollars and zero cents; Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leonardo-Beckmann, Diane) Modified on 8/25/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Eight-four thousand nine hundred sixty-three dollars and zero cents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Attorney's Office Eastern District of NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Diane C. Leonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighty-four thousand nine hundred sixty-three dollars and zero cents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?