Margaritis v. Mayo et al
Plaintiff: Peter Margaritis
Defendant: Goldsmith's Boat Shop Inc., The Giving Room LLC, Peconic Water Sports LLC and Laura Mayo
Case Number: 2:2020cv03995
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 10/20/2020 before Judge Gary R. Brown: Civil Cause for Telephone Pre Motion Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: David Golomb. Counsel for Defendant: James Mercante, Vesselin Mitev, Daniel Wooster, Stephen Grossman. Motion: To Remand. Movant: Plaintiff. Case called. Counsel for all sides present. Pre motion conference held. Motion schedule set. Motion served by: within 45 days. Response served by: 45 days after receipt of papers. Reply and all papers filed by: Within 10 days. (Tirado, Chelsea)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 2;20-CV-3995 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Giving Room LLC. (Grossman, Stephen)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,, by Goldsmith's Boat Shop Inc.. (Wooster, Daniel)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Giving Room LLC (Grossman, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Grossman on behalf of The Giving Room LLC (aty to be noticed) (Grossman, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #10 Letter filed by Peter Margaritis. Per the undersigned's individual rules, for the purposes of time requirements for the filing of motions under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), a pre-motion conference letter will be considered the equivalent of the motion itself. See II.f.2. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/25/2020. (Meil, Stephen)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Goldsmith's Boat Shop Inc., Peconic Water Sports LLC, The Giving Room LLC by Laura Mayo. (Mitev, Vesselin)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Vesselin Venelinov Mitev on behalf of Laura Mayo (aty to be noticed) (Mitev, Vesselin)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goldsmith's Boat Shop Inc. (Wooster, Daniel)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Laura Mayo, Peconic Water Sports LLC, The Giving Room LLC by Goldsmith's Boat Shop Inc.. (Wooster, Daniel)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 Letter Deeming Remand Motion Timely Filed by Peter Margaritis (Golomb, David)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court State of New York filed by Peconic Water Sports LLC. (Poling, Kristin)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion.A pre-motion telephone conference is scheduled for October 20, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Gary R. Brown, at which time the parties should be prepared to address plaintiff's anticipated motion to remand this action to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, DE 8. The parties are further advised that, in light of the Court's obligation to examine its subject matter jurisdiction sua sponte, they should be prepared to discuss the citizenship of each of the members of the defendant LLCs, as limited liability companies take the citizenship of each of their members. See Bayerische Landesbank, New York Branch v. Aladdin Capital Management LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012). Counsel are to call (888) 363-4734 using ACCESS CODE 4132441 five minutes prior to the designated time.The parties are on notice that in appropriate cases, the pre-motion letter and the response, along with counsels' arguments made at the pre-motion conference, may be construed at the discretion of the Court as the motion itself. Arguments not raised in the pre-motion letters or during the pre-motion conference shall be deemed waived. See In re Best Payphones, Inc., 450 F. App'x 8, 15 (2d Cir. 2011).At the conference, the Court will issue a briefing schedule if necessary. Defendants are directed to respond to DE 8 in accordance with the undersigned's individual rules by September 30, 2020. Before requesting an adjournment, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter with several proposed dates. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/15/2020. (Meil, Stephen)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court State of New York by Peter Margaritis. (Golomb, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Peter Margaritis (Golomb, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Laura Mayo, The Giving Room LLC by Peconic Water Sports LLC. (Poling, Kristin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Golomb on behalf of Peter Margaritis (aty to be noticed) (Golomb, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Peconic Water Sports LLC (Poling, Kristin)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Peconic Water Sports LLC from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 608819/2020. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-13275420) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Poling, Kristin) Modified on 8/28/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).
August 27, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margaritis v. Mayo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Margaritis
Represented By: Frank A. Longo
Represented By: David B. Golomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldsmith's Boat Shop Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Wooster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Giving Room LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peconic Water Sports LLC
Represented By: Kristin Eileen Poling
Represented By: James Edward Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Mayo
Represented By: Vesselin Venelinov Mitev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?