Killoran v. Westhampton Beach School District et al
Plaintiff: Christian Killoran
Defendant: Mary Anne Ambrosini, Joyce Donneson, Michael Raddy, Suzanne Mensch, George Kast, Westhampton Beach School District and Halsey C. Stevens
Case Number: 2:2020cv04121
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service of Motion to Dismiss by Mary Anne Ambrosini, Joyce Donneson, George Kast, Suzanne Mensch, Michael Raddy, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District (Leahey, Anne)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mary Anne Ambrosini, Joyce Donneson, George Kast, Suzanne Mensch, Michael Raddy, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Leahey, Anne)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-GRB-SIL, 17-cv-3553-ADS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-6663-JS-SIL, 20-cv-269-JS-SIL and 20-cv-4763-JS-SIL The Case was directly assigned as a related Pro Se/Habeas Case. (Cox, Dwayne)
October 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Anne Ambrosini, Joyce Donneson, George Kast, Suzanne Mensch, Michael Raddy, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District of electronic order setting briefing schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Leahey, Anne)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #12 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court finds a pre-motion conference unnecessary and sets the following briefing schedule: Defendants' motion shall be filed on or before October 30, 2020; Plaintiff's opposition by November 30, 2020; and Defendants' reply, if any, by December 14, 2020. Defendants are directed to mail a copy of this Electronic Order to the pro se Plaintiff and file proof of service on ECF on or before October 6, 2020. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/2/2020. (Alessi, Samantha)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter by Christian Killoran (Killoran, Christian)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss by Mary Anne Ambrosini, Joyce Donneson, George Kast, Suzanne Mensch, Michael Raddy, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District. (Leahey, Anne)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Valle, Christine)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter regarding representation and pacer bounces by Mary Anne Ambrosini, Joyce Donneson, George Kast, Suzanne Mensch, Michael Raddy, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District (Leahey, Anne)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Allow Pro Se to Electronically File. The pro se party shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov.. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Electronic Order to the pro se Plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/16/2020. (Alessi, Samantha)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter MOTION to Expedite , Letter MOTION for leave to allow Pro Se to Electronically File by Christian Killoran. (Valle, Christine)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; As stated on the record, and herein, Plaintiff's request for emergency injunctive relief is DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/10/2020. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 9/9/2020 Re: THIS LETTER ACKNOWLEDGES RECEIPT OF YOUR CIVIL ACTION(S). (Valle, Christine)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joanna Seybert: Civil Cause for Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 9/8/2020. Case called. All counsel present. Hearing held Re: Order to Show Cause. Decision Reserved. The Court will render a decision as stated on the record. Court Reporter: M. Foley. (Valle, Christine)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Order to Show Cause and Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Leahey Aff -Joint Letter (doubles as Ex A Ambrosini Aff), #2 Seaman Affirmation in Oppositionr in i, #3 Ex. A Seaman Aff - Supporting Aff, #4 Ambrosini Affidavit in Opp, #5 Ex B Ambrosini Letter to parents -8.28.2020, #6 Ex. C Ambrosini Letter to parent - 8.31.2020M, #7 Ex. D Ambrosini Letter to parents - 9.3.2020) (Leahey, Anne)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Valle, Christine)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne C. Leahey on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Leahey, Anne)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-GRB-SIL, 17-cv-3553-ADS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-6663-JS-SIL and 20-cv-269-JS-SIL The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Cox, Dwayne)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Court has received Plaintiff's combined Complaint and Affidavit in Support of an Order to Show Cause (Docket Entry 1) against the Westhampton Beach School District and several individual Defendants. There is no indication from the document that Plaintiff served them on Defendants or notified them of its filing. The Court is familiar with Plaintiff and the many related cases concerning his son's education. Although proceeding pro se, Plaintiff is a licensed attorney in the State of New York and frequent litigant before this Court. The Court will conduct a TELEPHONE HEARING on the record on the proposed Order to Show Cause on Tuesday, September 8, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Parties should dial 1 (877) 336-1839 and enter access code 7231185# at the prompt. If you receive any message denying or delaying entry, hang up and call back. Because, as Plaintiff himself indicates, time is of the essence, the Pro Se Office is directed to immediately contact Plaintiff and instruct him to, by 5:00 p.m. TODAY, September 3, 2020: (1) serve a copy of the Complaint and Affidavit in Support of an Order to Show Cause (Docket Entry 1) bearing Docket Number 20-4121 upon Defendants so they may file a notice of appearance and begin receiving case notifications AND (2) serve a copy of this Order on Defendants.Should Defendants wish to respond in writing before the hearing, they shall file any opposition on ECF by 11:00 a.m. on Tuesday, September 8, 2020, and email a copy to Plaintiff in advance of the hearing. Plaintiff may also view and entries on this docket on PACER.gov. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/3/2020. (Alessi, Samantha)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Order to Show Cause by Christian Killoran (Cox, Dwayne)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Affidavit in Support of Order to Show Cause against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Christian Killoran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killoran v. Westhampton Beach School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Anne Ambrosini
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Donneson
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Raddy
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Mensch
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kast
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westhampton Beach School District
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halsey C. Stevens
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?