Laser v. Apple Bank for Savings
Plaintiff: Linda Laser
Defendant: Apple Bank for Savings
Case Number: 2:2020cv04257
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto for all further proceedings. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/28/2020. (Cubano, Jazmin)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled to be held before the undersigned on 11/16/2020 is converted to a telephone conference and rescheduled for 11:30 AM. At the designated time, the Parties shall call Chambers teleconferencing number, (877) 336-1280 , and follow the automated instructions; the access code is: 7215690 . Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/27/2020. c/ECF (Adell, April)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Laser. (Solotoff, Darryn)
October 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Apple Bank for Savings time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 11/16/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/11/2020. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Stipulation to be So-Order Adjourning Defendant's Time to Answer Complaint by Apple Bank for Savings. (Zourigui, Jennifer)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Laser. Apple Bank for Savings served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Solotoff, Darryn)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Apple Bank for Savings. (Landow, Concetta)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/16/2020 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/14/2020. c/ECF (Adell, April)
September 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Bank for Savings filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13348854 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Linda Laser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Solotoff, Darryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laser v. Apple Bank for Savings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Laser
Represented By: Darryn G. Solotoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Bank for Savings
Represented By: Jennifer Blaire Zourigui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?