Christopher v. Dundas et al
Plaintiff: Quinn Christopher, as Executrix of the Estate of Theodore Christopher (deceased) and Quinn Christopher
Defendant: Timothy Dundas, as the Co-Administrator of the Estate of Charles P. Dundas (deceased), Thomas Dundas, as the Co-Administrator of the Estate of Charles P. Dundas (deceased), Thomas Dundas and Timothy Dundas
Case Number: 2:2020cv04265
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ted N Gianaris on behalf of Quinn Christopher (notification declined or already on case) (Gianaris, Ted)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ted Gianaris Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13550308. by Quinn Christopher. (Attachments: #1 Appendix IL Cert of Good Standing) (Gianaris, Ted)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Having reviewed the Pro Hac Vice application #11 submitted by Ted Gianaris for plaintiff Quinn Christopher, individually and as the executrix of the Estate of Theodore Christopher, and found it to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the application is approved. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he/she receives electronic notifications of activity in this case. The attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted or has been submitted to the Clerks Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/23/2020. (DeSaro, Matthew)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ted Gianaris Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13550308. by Quinn Christopher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Gianaris, Ted)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER temporarily denying #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 is temporarily denied because the supporting affidavit has not been notarized and the Certificate of Good Standing for the State of Illinois is expired. Counsel shall supplement the application with a properly notarized supporting affidavit and a current Certificate of Good Standing no later than October 29th or the Motion will be fully denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/20/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Quinn Christopher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Breit, Mitchell)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to November 30th to Answer for All Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/1/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quinn Christopher. Thomas Dundas served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Truong, Thien An)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quinn Christopher. Timothy Dundas served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Truong, Thien An)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Thomas Dundas. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Timothy Dundas. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thien An Vinh Truong on behalf of Quinn Christopher (aty to be noticed) (Truong, Thien An)
September 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Dundas, Timothy Dundas, filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13350408, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Quinn Christopher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Breit, Mitchell) Modified on 9/14/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher v. Dundas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dundas, as the Co-Administrator of the Estate of Charles P. Dundas (deceased)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dundas, as the Co-Administrator of the Estate of Charles P. Dundas (deceased)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dundas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dundas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn Christopher, as Executrix of the Estate of Theodore Christopher (deceased)
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn Christopher
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Ted N Gianaris
Represented By: Thien An Vinh Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?