Peters v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dawn Peters
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04704
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER. In light of Judge Feuerstein's Order dated November 19, 2020, the Court has set this case down for a Telephone Conference on November 30, 2020 at 10 a.m. Counsel are requested to utilize the Court's teleconferencing line at 866-590-5055, access code 9720458, at the time of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 11/20/2020. (Wolf, Deanna)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/19/2020: Plaintiff and defendant's counsel present; Case called. OTHER: Outstanding discovery is respectfully referred to the assigned magistrate judge. All discovery shall be complete by 6/21/2021. A further telephone status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 6/21/2021 at 10:30 am. The parties are directed to call the teleconferencing number (877) 336-1280 and follow the automated instructions. The access code is 7215690. (Cubano, Jazmin)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Wagner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Wagner, Stuart)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. At that time, the parties are directed to call the teleconferencing number (877) 336-1280 and follow the automated instructions; the access code is 7215690. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/19/2020. (Disbrow, Sandra)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein for all further proceedings. Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 10/16/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Brosnan, Aisha)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Brosnan, Aisha)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Other Affiliate Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart De Mexico, Other Affiliate SEIYU for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Brosnan, Aisha)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 710644/2020. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-13461726) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint and Verified Answer, #2 Exhibit B-CPLR 3017 Demand, #3 Exhibit C-Response to 3017 Demand) (Brosnan, Aisha) Modified on 10/5/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Aisha K. Brosnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Aisha K. Brosnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Peters
Represented By: Eric H. Morrison
Represented By: Stuart Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?