Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach School District et al
Plaintiff: Terrie Killoran and Christian Killoran
Defendant: Joyce Donnesson, Suzanne Mensch, Mary Ann Ambrosini, Westhampton Beach School District and Michael Radday
Case Number: 2:2020cv04763
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Ann Ambrosini, Joyce Donnesson, Suzanne Mensch, Michael Radday, Westhampton Beach School District of Verified Answer to Verified Complaint (Leahey, Anne)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Leahey, Anne)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Christian Killoran. (Valle, Christine)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Court's records reflect that the Complaint in this action was filed on October 5, 2020. Accordingly, service must be made upon Defendants by January 4, 2021 and Plaintiffs shall file proof of such service with the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiffs. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/20/2020. C/M; C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne C. Leahey on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Leahey, Anne)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 10/14/2020 Re: THIS LETTER ACKNOWLEDGES RECEIPT OF YOUR CIVIL ACTION(S). (Coleman, Laurie)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-GRB-SIL, 17-cv-3553-ADS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-6663-JS-SIL, 20-cv-269-JS-SIL and 20-cv-4121-JS-SIL The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Cox, Dwayne)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 30213 (Cox, Dwayne)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Terrie Killoran, Christian Killoran, Christian Killoran(on behalf of his son, A.K.). (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Donnesson
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Mensch
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Ambrosini
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westhampton Beach School District
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Radday
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?