Cain v. U.S. Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Vester Cain
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, as successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated as of March 1, 2007, GSAMP Trust 2007-HE2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-HE2, Owen Loan Servicing, LLC and U.S. Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv05034
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike #6 Notice (Other), - Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to Title 28: 1446(b)(l) back to the Nassau County Supreme Court I by Owen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike, #3 Certificate of Service) (Weiss, Adam)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the defendants' motion to dismiss the pro se plaintiff's complaint. The plaintiff's opposition is due November 30, 2020. The defendants' reply, if any, is due December 15, 2020. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this scheduling order to the pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 10/30/2020. (Kostopoulos, Georgia)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to Title 28: 1446(b)(l) back to the Nassau County Supreme Court Index No. 000531/2020 the Original Court of Jurisdiction Due to the Defendants and their attorney Adam Weiss Committing Criminal Fraud and Criminal Perjury and Trying to Escape Justice in the State Court, submitted by Vester Cain, plaintiff pro se. (Guzzi, Roseann)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 12(b)(5) by Owen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Adam D. Weiss in Support of Motion, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Certificate of Service) (Weiss, Adam)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHH Mortgage Corporation, as successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated as of March 1, 2007, GSAMP Trust 2007-HE2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-HE2 re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Weiss, Adam)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank, National Association, Owen Loan Servicing, LLC from Nassau County Supreme Court, case number 000531/2020. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-13552589) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Weiss, Adam) Modified on 10/21/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cain v. U.S. Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, as successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Adam David Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated as of March 1, 2007, GSAMP Trust 2007-HE2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-HE2
Represented By: Adam David Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Adam David Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Adam David Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vester Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?