ExteNet Systems Inc. v. The Town of East Hampton
Plaintiff: ExteNet Systems Inc.
Defendant: The Town of East Hampton
Case Number: 2:2020cv05505
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Town of East Hampton. (Wright, Kelly)
December 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Jarlath Scahill on behalf of The Town of East Hampton (notification declined or already on case) (Scahill, Francis)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E Wright on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Wright, Kelly)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for The Town of East Hampton to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including January 11, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/22/2020. (Jacobwitz, Beth)
December 21, 2020 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information re #8 : Counsel is advised that they must submit a notice of appearance signed by them and using their own individual accounts in order to be added to this case. (Cubano, Jazmin)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer extension to 1/11/21 by The Town of East Hampton. (Scahill, Francis)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Jarlath Scahill on behalf of The Town of East Hampton (aty to be noticed) (Scahill, Francis)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ExteNet Systems Inc.. The Town of East Hampton served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Goodhouse, Brendan)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Town of East Hampton. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by ExteNet Systems Inc. (Goodhouse, Brendan)
November 12, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The second page of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. The current 2 page document can be found on the court's website. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ExteNet Systems Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mount Royal Holdings, LLC for ExteNet Systems Inc.. (Goodhouse, Brendan)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Town of East Hampton filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13672961 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by ExteNet Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons) (Goodhouse, Brendan) Modified on 11/13/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ExteNet Systems Inc. v. The Town of East Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of East Hampton
Represented By: Kelly E Wright
Represented By: Francis Jarlath Scahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ExteNet Systems Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Markham Goodhouse
Represented By: Haran C. Rashes
Represented By: Christopher B. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?