In the Matter of the Complaint of Peconic Jet Ski, LLC v. The Estate of Lisa Margaritis
Petitioner: In The Matter of The Complaint of Peconic Jet Ski, LLC as Owner of an 11-foot, Connelly 3D stand up paddle vessel for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability and Peconic Jet Ski, LLC
Interested Party: Peter Margaritis
In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Peconic Jet Ski, LLC
Claimant: The Estate of Lisa Margaritis
Case Number: 2:2020cv05589
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for Pre Motion Conference, #12 Pre-Motion Letter in light of the briefing schedule set forth on October 20, 2020 by the undersigned in related case 2:20-cv-03995-GRB-SIL, Margaritis v. Mayo et al. The parties in this case are directed to follow the same briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/5/2021. (Meil, Stephen)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion to Reassign Case in light of the Chief Judge's Order of December 28, 2020 in related case no. 2:20-cv-05493-GRB-SIL, Margaritis v. Peconic Jet Ski LLC. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/30/2020. (Meil, Stephen)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 Letter MOTION to Reassign Case pending before Judge Hurley (20-cv-5493) to cases pending before Judge Brown (20-cv-3995 & 20-cv-5589) by Peter Margaritis. (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 Letter Pre-Motion Letter to Remand Related Case to State Court by Peter Margaritis (Golomb, David)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY in Opposition re #6 MOTION for pre motion conference in connection with anticipated motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) [lack of subject matter jurisdiction] filed by In the Matter of the Complaint of Peconic Jet Ski, LLC, Peconic Jet Ski, LLC. (Poling, Kristin)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Golomb on behalf of Peter Margaritis (aty to be noticed) (Golomb, David)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke for all further proceedings. Judge Joan M. Azrack, Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 12/1/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Consolidate Cases into Limitation Action (20-cv-5589-JMA-ST) and opposition to motion of Peconic Jet Ski LLC by Peter Margaritis. (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Peconic Jet Ski, LLC. (Mercante, James)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank A. Longo on behalf of The Estate of Lisa Margaritis (aty to be noticed) (Longo, Frank)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for pre motion conference in connection with anticipated motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) [lack of subject matter jurisdiction] by Peter Margaritis. (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew V. Buchsbaum on behalf of Peter Margaritis (aty to be noticed) (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates that Cases 20-cv-03995 (GRB)(SIL) and 20-cv-05493 (DRH)(AKT) are related cases. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 18, 2020 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Added missing Claimant to the case. Deleted Document Entry No. 1, initially filed as against Petitioner, and re-entered as against Claimant. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 17, 2020 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-13695781 (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Estate of Lisa Margaritis Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Peconic Jet Ski, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Waiver, #2 Exhibit B-Value of the SUP Vessel, #3 Exhibit C-Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Notice, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Complaint of Peconic Jet Ski, LLC v. The Estate of Lisa Margaritis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In The Matter of The Complaint of Peconic Jet Ski, LLC as Owner of an 11-foot, Connelly 3D stand up paddle vessel for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Represented By: Kristin Eileen Poling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peconic Jet Ski, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Eileen Poling
Represented By: James Edward Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Peter Margaritis
Represented By: David B. Golomb
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Peconic Jet Ski, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: The Estate of Lisa Margaritis
Represented By: Frank A. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?