Soussis v. Macco et al
Appellee: U.S. Trustee and Michael J. Macco
Appellant: Julia F. Soussis
Case Number: 2:2020cv05673
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Bankruptcy Record Received (8-19-73686-reg). Notice to all parties, in accordance with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), that the record has been received or is available electronically. Parties shall now follow briefing schedule as set forth in Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018. Specifically, appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days of this notice, the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellants brief, and the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellees brief, but a reply brief must be filed at least 7 days before scheduled argument. (Attachments: #1 20-cv-05673 Appellee Designation, #2 Amended claim filed 1-6-20, #3 Amended claim filed 1-21-20, #4 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (BK, #5 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (BK: Notice Recipients) (Florio, Lisa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #6 20-cv-05673 Appellee Designation Transcript 19-73686 hearing held 9-10-20) (Florio, Lisa).
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Velez-Rivera on behalf of U.S. Trustee (aty to be noticed) (Velez-Rivera, Andrew)
November 20, 2020 Notice that appeal from the Bankruptcy Court has been docketed. Parties shall file with the Bankruptcy Clerk their designations of items to be included in the record and statement of issues to be presented pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. (U.S.B.C# 8-19-73686-reg) (McMahon, Carol)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 8-19-73686-reg., filed by Julia F. Soussis. (Attachments: #1 USBC Doc#51 - Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 USBC Doc#57 - Documents, #3 USBC Doc#57 - Bankruptcy Court Docket, #4 USBC Doc#57 - Transmittal of Notice, #5 USBC Doc#57 - Notice Recipients) (McMahon, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soussis v. Macco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Andrew D. Velez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael J. Macco
Represented By: Michael J. Macco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julia F. Soussis
Represented By: Jeffrey Herzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?