Sylvestre v. JS North Shore Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Jacques Sylvestre
Defendant: JS North Shore Motors, LLC doing business as Advantage Honda
Case Number: 2:2020cv05968
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 3/9/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 SIL Individual Rules, #2 Scheduling Order Worksheet) (Gandiosi, Kristin)
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JS North Shore Motors, LLC. (Monaghan, Kyle)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Francis Oakes Monaghan on behalf of JS North Shore Motors, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Monaghan, Kyle)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Francis Oakes Monaghan on behalf of JS North Shore Motors, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Monaghan, Kyle)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacques Sylvestre. JS North Shore Motors, LLC served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. (Nahoum, Robert)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to JS North Shore Motors, LLC. (Tirado, Chelsea)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Jacques Sylvestre (Nahoum, Robert)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
December 10, 2020 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Landow, Concetta)
December 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Landow, Concetta).
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by JACQUES SYLVESTRE (Nahoum, Robert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by JACQUES SYLVESTRE (Nahoum, Robert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JS NORTH SHORE MOTORS, LLC dba ADVANTAGE HONDA filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13800951 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by JACQUES SYLVESTRE. (Nahoum, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sylvestre v. JS North Shore Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JS North Shore Motors, LLC doing business as Advantage Honda
Represented By: Kyle Francis Oakes Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques Sylvestre
Represented By: Robert J. Nahoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?