Power Up Lending Group, Ltd. v. THC Therapeutics, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Power Up Lending Group, Ltd.
Defendant: Transhare Corporation, THC Therapeutics, Inc., Parker Mitchell and Brandon Romanek
Case Number: 2:2020cv06382
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER: In sum, the Court finds that removal was improper and remands this case in its entirety to New York Supreme Court. Thus,It is on this 12th day of January 2021: ORDERED, that Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks remand and is otherwise DENIED. THC Defendants Motion, for the reasons stated above, is DENIED in itsentirety. ORDERED, that THC Defendants attorney is directed to pay Plaintiff $500.00 for costs associated with responding to THC Defendants Motion. ORDERED, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. See attached. So Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/12/2021. (Cubano, Jazmin)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Status Conference held on 1/11/2021: Plaintiff and defendants counsel present; Case called. OTHER: Ruling set forth on the record. Case is remanded to the state court. Written order to follow. Case Closed. (Court Reporter Fred Guerino.) (Cubano, Jazmin)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The conference scheduled for 1/12/2021 is advanced to 1/11/2021 at 2:30 pm. At that time, the parties are directed to call the teleconferencing number (877) 336-1280 and follow the automated instructions; the access code is 7215690. Based on the parties' consent, the 1/11/2021 conference will resolve all issues before the Court at this time. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/11/2021. (Schiraldi, Patricia)
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction seeking emergency relief and in opposition to motion to remand to state court. Letter to District Court Judge filed by Power Up Lending Group, Ltd.. (Naidich, Richard)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 Letter re Transhare's stated intent to ignore this Court's order. by THC Therapeutics, Inc. (Davis, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: All proceedings, applications, and motions in this matter are stayed and all parties are enjoined from transferring and/or alienating any of the property in this action pending the conference on 1/12/2021 at 9 am. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/9/2021. (Schiraldi, Patricia)
January 9, 2021 Filing 11 Letter re requested immediate conference on emergency motion for preliminary injunction by THC Therapeutics, Inc. (Davis, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction seeking emergency relief and in opposition to motion to remand to state court. by THC Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - proposed OTSC, #4 Exhibit A - MOL, #5 Exhibit A - affidavit, #6 Exhibit AA, #7 Exhibit AB, #8 Exhibit AC, #9 Exhibit AD, #10 Exhibit AE, #11 Exhibit AF, #12 Exhibit AG, #13 Exhibit AH, #14 Exhibit AI, #15 Exhibit AJ, #16 Exhibit AK, #17 Exhibit AL, #18 Exhibit B, #19 Exhibit C) (Davis, Jeffrey)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/7/2021: Plaintiff and defendants counsel present; Case called. OTHER: Any opposition must be served by Monday at 10:00 am. A telephone conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein is on 1/12/2021 at 9:00 am. At the designated time, the Parties are to call Chambers' teleconferencing number, (877) 336-1280, and follow the automated instructions; the access code is: 7215690. (Cubano, Jazmin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Samuel Feldman on behalf of Power Up Lending Group, Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Feldman, Bernard)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. At that time, the parties are directed to call the teleconferencing number (877) 336-1280 and follow the automated instructions; the access code is 7215690. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/6/2021. (Schiraldi, Patricia)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and to extend and continue temporary restraining order entered by State Court, and for injunctive relief and to hold defendants in contempt failing remand by Power Up Lending Group, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of C. Kramer, #2 Ex A - Order dtd 12-24-20, #3 Ex B - Notice of Removal with Notice of filing, #4 Ex C - CPN dtd 2-19-20, #5 Ex D - SPA dtd 2-19-20, #6 Ex E - CPN dtd 4-29-20, #7 Ex F - SPA dtd 4-29-20, #8 Ex G - Spreadsheet 2-19-20, #9 Ex H - Spreadsheet 4-29-20, #10 Ex I - Notice of Default, #11 Ex J - copies of 4 opinion letters, #12 Ex K - copy of 5th opinion letter, #13 Ex L - Press releases, #14 Ex M - Transfer Agent Letters, #15 Ex N - Correspondence between Transhare and Power Up's counsel, #16 Ex O - Summons and Complaint, #17 Ex P - Form 10-Q, #18 Ex Q - Copies of Bloomberg Reports, #19 Ex R - Mr. Davis' ltr dtd 12-15-20, #20 Ex S - Copy of OSC dtd 12-30-20, #21 Ex T - Affidavits of Service - Transhare, #22 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law, #23 Declaration pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(d)) (Johnson, Robert)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Naidich on behalf of Power Up Lending Group, Ltd. (notification declined or already on case) (Naidich, Richard)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Johnson on behalf of Power Up Lending Group, Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Johnson, Robert)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Parker Mitchell, Brandon Romanek, THC Therapeutics, Inc. (Davis, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/4/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Parker Mitchell, Brandon Romanek, THC Therapeutics, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 614700/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-13918146). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed OTSC, #2 Exhibit Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Memo of Law, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L) (Davis, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/4/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Up Lending Group, Ltd. v. THC Therapeutics, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transhare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THC Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Mitchell
Represented By: Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Romanek
Represented By: Jeffrey Kevin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Up Lending Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Richard S. Naidich
Represented By: Bernard Samuel Feldman
Represented By: Robert P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?