Cyganowski v. Decision Diagnostics Corp.
Plaintiff: Melanie L. Cyganowski
Defendant: Decision Diagnostics Corp.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00888
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference dated March 22, 2021 by Melanie L. Cyganowski. (Silverstein, Adam)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald S Herzog on behalf of Decision Diagnostics Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Herzog, Ronald)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Move or Answer Complaint by Decision Diagnostics Corp. (Herzog, Ronald)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER TO ANSWER re #9 Stipulation filed by Decision Diagnostics Corp.: The stipulation extending the time for Defendant Decision Diagnostics Corp. to answer or otherwise move is extended to 4/19/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/22/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie L. Cyganowski. Decision Diagnostics Corp. served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Silverstein, Adam)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Melanie L. Cyganowski identifying Other Affiliate Alpha Credit Resources LLC for Melanie L. Cyganowski. (Silverstein, Adam)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Decision Diagnostics Corp.. (Ortiz, Grisel)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, Quality Control Check - Summons, by Melanie L. Cyganowski (Silverstein, Adam)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates that Case No. 1:16-cv-06848 (BMC) is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Davis, Kimberly) Modified on 2/19/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2021: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
February 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 19, 2021 Your Proposed Summons was not issued for the following reason: The caption on the Proposed Summons does not match the caption on the Complaint, Please correct the Proposed Summons and resubmit it using the Event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Decision Diagnostics Corp., filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14168249 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes,, filed by Melanie L. Cyganowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Silverstein, Adam) Modified on 2/19/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyganowski v. Decision Diagnostics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie L. Cyganowski
Represented By: Adam C. Silverstein
Represented By: Andrew S. Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decision Diagnostics Corp.
Represented By: Ronald S Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?