The County of Genesee et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: The County of Steuben, The City of Buffalo, The County of Clinton, The County of Chemung, The County of Livingston, The County of Orleans, The City of Poughkeepsie, The City of Mount Vernon, The County of Cortland, The County of Hamilton, The County of Madison, The County of Rensselaer, The City of Saratoga Springs, The County of Genesee, The County of Chautauqua, The County of Chenango, The County of Niagara, The City of Ithaca, The Town of Poughkeepsie, The Town of Auburn and The City of Kingston
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01039
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Genesee Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - County of Genesee Court Notice (ECF 7), #4 Exhibit 4 - Claim No. 87912 (Genesee), #5 Exhibit 5 - Claim No. 82196 (Buffalo), #6 Exhibit 6 - Claim No. 83234 (Chautauqua), #7 Exhibit 7 - Claim No. 83241 (Hamilton), #8 Exhibit 8 - Claim No. 86912 (City of Poughkeepsie), #9 Exhibit 9 - Claim No. 86947 (Mount Vernon), #10 Exhibit 10 - Claim No. 86964 (Cortland), #11 Exhibit 11 - Claim No. 87645 (Auburn), #12 Exhibit 12 - Claim No. 87668 (Chemung), #13 Exhibit 13 - Claim No. 87696 (Clinton), #14 Exhibit 14 - Claim No. 87916 (Chenango), #15 Exhibit 15 - Claim No. 88113 (Steuben), #16 Exhibit 16 - Claim No. 88127 (Kingston), #17 Exhibit 17 - Claim No. 88142 (Livingston), #18 Exhibit 18 - Claim No. 88214 (Ithaca), #19 Exhibit 19 - Claim No. 89292 (Niagara), #20 Exhibit 20 - Claim No. 89341 (Rensselaer), #21 Exhibit 21 - Claim No. 89720 (Orleans), #22 Exhibit 22 - Claim No. 144742 (Madison), #23 Exhibit 23 - Claim No. 144743 (Town of Poughkeepsie), #24 Exhibit 24 - Claim No. 148568 (Saratoga Springs), #25 Exhibit 25 - Purdue (2487) Plan, #26 Exhibit 26 - Hon. Jones Order) (Bernard, James)
April 23, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Bernard, James)
March 31, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Notice of MOTION to Stay /Notice of Motion for a Stay Pending The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation's Decision On Defendant's Motion For Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Bernard, James)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Upon review of Defendant's request for an extension (ECF No. #19 ) and Plaintiffs' opposition (ECF No. #21 ), Defendant's request is GRANTED. The Court hereby revises the briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' motion to remand as follows: Defendant shall file its opposition on or before April 23, 2021; and Plaintiffs shall file their reply, if any, on or before May 7, 2021. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/30/2021. (Dimarco, Nicholas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand or Abstention (ECF Doc 17) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Badala, Salvatore)
March 26, 2021 Filing 20 STATE COURT RECORD received from Suffolk County Clerk's Office for E-filed Supreme Court Case, Index No. 400002/2021. (Valle, Christine)
March 26, 2021 Filing 19 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand or Abstention (ECF Doc 17) by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Cheifetz, David)
March 24, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Notice of MOTION to Stay /Notice of Motion for a Stay Pending The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation's Decision On Defendant's Motion For Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Plaintiffs' memorandum of Law in Opposition to McKinsey's Motion to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Badala, Salvatore)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The City of Buffalo, The City of Ithaca, The City of Kingston, The City of Mount Vernon, The City of Poughkeepsie, The City of Saratoga Springs, The County of Chautauqua, The County of Chemung, The County of Chenango, The County of Clinton, The County of Cortland, The County of Genesee, The County of Hamilton, The County of Livingston, The County of Madison, The County of Niagara, The County of Orleans, The County of Rensselaer, The County of Steuben, The Town of Auburn, The Town of Poughkeepsie. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand or Abstention, #2 Declaration Declaration of Salvatore C. Badala, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration) (Badala, Salvatore)
March 15, 2021 Filing 16 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Notice of MOTION to Stay /Notice of Motion for a Stay Pending The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation's Decision On Defendant's Motion For Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings, #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, /James L. Bernard Unopposed Letter Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer, Move or otherwise Respond to the Complaint by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Bernard, James)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 Copy of Motion of Defendants for Transfer Of Actions Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1407 For Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. Originally filed before the JPMDL. (Marziliano, August)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 Notice of MOTION to Stay /Notice of Motion for a Stay Pending The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation's Decision On Defendant's Motion For Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Bernard, James)
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of MOTION to Stay /Notice of Motion for a Stay Pending The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation's Decision On Defendant's Motion For Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Bernard, James)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Stay. All future filings related to Defendant's Motion to Stay shall be directed to undersigned. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/10/2021. (Dimarco, Nicholas)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 Letter in response to Mr. Bernard's correspondence dated March 8, 2021 (ECF No. 11) by The City of Buffalo, The City of Ithaca, The City of Kingston, The City of Mount Vernon, The City of Poughkeepsie, The City of Saratoga Springs, The County of Chautauqua, The County of Chemung, The County of Chenango, The County of Clinton, The County of Cortland, The County of Genesee, The County of Hamilton, The County of Livingston, The County of Madison, The County of Niagara, The County of Orleans, The County of Rensselaer, The County of Steuben, The Town of Auburn, The Town of Poughkeepsie (Badala, Salvatore)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document /James L. Bernard Letter Motion for leave to file Motion to Stay Proceedings before Judge Seybert by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Bernard, James)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by McKinsey & Company, Inc. /Notice of Filing with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of Motion to Transfer for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit B - Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer, #3 Exhibit C - Schedule of Actions, #4 Exhibit D - Dockets and Complaints, #5 Exhibit E - Dockets and Complaints, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration and Exhibits) (Bernard, James)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks on behalf of The City of Buffalo, The City of Ithaca, The City of Kingston, The City of Mount Vernon, The City of Poughkeepsie, The City of Saratoga Springs, The County of Chautauqua, The County of Chemung, The County of Chenango, The County of Clinton, The County of Cortland, The County of Genesee, The County of Hamilton, The County of Livingston, The County of Madison, The County of Niagara, The County of Orleans, The County of Rensselaer, The County of Steuben, The Town of Auburn, The Town of Poughkeepsie (aty to be noticed) (Sacks, Shayna)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L Ciaccio on behalf of The City of Buffalo, The City of Ithaca, The City of Kingston, The City of Mount Vernon, The City of Poughkeepsie, The City of Saratoga Springs, The County of Chautauqua, The County of Chemung, The County of Chenango, The County of Clinton, The County of Cortland, The County of Genesee, The County of Hamilton, The County of Livingston, The County of Madison, The County of Niagara, The County of Orleans, The County of Rensselaer, The County of Steuben, The Town of Auburn, The Town of Poughkeepsie (aty to be noticed) (Ciaccio, Joseph)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore C. Badala on behalf of The City of Buffalo, The City of Ithaca, The City of Kingston, The City of Mount Vernon, The City of Poughkeepsie, The City of Saratoga Springs, The County of Chautauqua, The County of Chemung, The County of Chenango, The County of Clinton, The County of Cortland, The County of Genesee, The County of Hamilton, The County of Livingston, The County of Madison, The County of Niagara, The County of Orleans, The County of Rensselaer, The County of Steuben, The Town of Auburn, The Town of Poughkeepsie (aty to be noticed) (Badala, Salvatore)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and Exhibits, Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Civil Cover Sheet, served on Salvatore C. Badala, Esq., Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC, 400 Broadhollow Road, Suite 305, Melville, New York, 11747 and Salvatore C. Badala, Esq., Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC, 360 Lexington Avenue, 11th Floor, New York, NY 10017 on February 26, 2021, filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Bernard, James)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Bernard, James)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Bernard, James)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc. from Supreme Court, Suffolk County, case number 400002/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14206212) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Genesee Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Purdue Voluntary Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Claim No. 87912 (Genesee), #5 Exhibit 5 - Claim No. 82196 (Buffalo), #6 Exhibit 6 - Claim No. 83234 (Chautauqua), #7 Exhibit 7 - Claim No. 83241 (Hamilton), #8 Exhibit 8 - Claim No. 86912 (City of Poughkeepsie), #9 Exhibit 9 - Claim No. 86947 (Mount Vernon), #10 Exhibit 10 - Claim No. 86964 (Cortland), #11 Exhibit 11 - Claim No. 87645 (Auburn), #12 Exhibit 12 - Claim No. 87668 (Chemung), #13 Exhibit 13 - Claim No. 87696 (Clinton), #14 Exhibit 14 - Claim No. 87916 (Chenango), #15 Exhibit 15 - Claim No. 88113 (Steuben), #16 Exhibit 16 - Claim No. 88127 (Kingston), #17 Exhibit 17 - Claim No. 88142 (Livingston), #18 Exhibit 18 - Claim No. 88214 (Ithaca), #19 Exhibit 19 - Claim No. 89292 (Niagara), #20 Exhibit 20 - Claim No. 89341 (Rensselaer), #21 Exhibit 21 - Claim No. 89720 (Orleans), #22 Exhibit 22 - Claim No. 144742 (Madison), #23 Exhibit 23 - Claim No. 144743 (Town of Poughkeepsie), #24 Exhibit 24 - Claim No. 148568 (Saratoga Springs), #25 Exhibit 25 - County of Genesee Court Notice) (Bernard, James) Modified on 2/26/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The County of Genesee et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Steuben
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Buffalo
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Clinton
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Chemung
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Livingston
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Orleans
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Poughkeepsie
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Mount Vernon
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Cortland
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Hamilton
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Madison
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Rensselaer
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Saratoga Springs
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Genesee
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Chautauqua
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Chenango
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Niagara
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Ithaca
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Town of Poughkeepsie
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Town of Auburn
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Kingston
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Joseph L Ciaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?