Urrutia v. Issama Food Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Elsa Urrutia
Defendant: Issama Food Corp. doing business as Gala Fresh Farms, Jacinto A. Pena and Luis Correa
Case Number: 2:2021cv01331
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Luis Correa, Issama Food Corp., Jacinto A. Pena. (Drogin, Laurent)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elsa Urrutia. Jacinto A. Pena served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Romero, Peter)
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elsa Urrutia. Luis Correa served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Romero, Peter)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elsa Urrutia. Issama Food Corp. served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. (Romero, Peter)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurent Scott Drogin on behalf of Luis Correa, Issama Food Corp., Jacinto A. Pena (aty to be noticed) (Drogin, Laurent)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Issama Food Corp. (Drogin, Laurent)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Luis Correa, Issama Food Corp., Jacinto A. Pena. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14273741 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Elsa Urrutia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Romero, Peter) Modified on 3/12/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).
March 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urrutia v. Issama Food Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Urrutia
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Issama Food Corp. doing business as Gala Fresh Farms
Represented By: Laurent Scott Drogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacinto A. Pena
Represented By: Laurent Scott Drogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Correa
Represented By: Laurent Scott Drogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?