United States of America v. One Million, Three Hundred Ten Thousand, Nine Hundred Fifty-Nine Dollars and Zero Cents ($1,310,959.00), seized on or about November 12, 2020 in College Point, New York
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Million, Three Hundred Ten Thousand, Nine Hundred Fifty-Nine Dollars and Zero Cents ($1,310,959.00), seized on or about November 12, 2020 in College Point, New York
Case Number: 2:2021cv01363
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE regarding # Administrative Order No. 2021-08 In Re: Matter of Cases Previously Assigned to the Honorable Sandra J. Feuerstein. As set forth in Admin. Order No. 2021-08, the duty to respond to the order is mandatory. Each party must indicate their intent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office within thirty (30) days of the date of the order. In the case of a newly added party, such party has thirty days from the date of appearance in the case in which to return their election form. Election Forms are NOT to be filed via ECF. They are to be sent to the Clerk of Court via email to consent@nyed.uscourts.gov or via United States mail to: United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722.CF. They are to be sent to the Clerk of Court via email to consent@nyed.uscourts.gov or via United States mail to: United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. (Cubano, Jazmin)
April 12, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: The conference scheduled to be held before Judge Feuerstein on 6/16/2021 is adjourned without date. c/ECF (Ortiz, Grisel)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Leonardo, Diane)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Leonardo, Diane)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. One Million, Three Hundred Ten Thousand, Nine Hundred Fifty-Nine Dollars and Zero Cents ($1,310,959.00), seized on or about November 12, 2020 in College Point, New York served on 3/18/2021. (Leonardo, Diane)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to One Million, Three Hundred Ten Thousand, Nine Hundred Fifty-Nine Dollars and Zero Cents ($1,310,959.00), seized on or about November 12, 2020 in College Point, New York. (Cubano, Jazmin)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Initial Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. At the designated time, the parties shall call Chambers' teleconferencing number, (877) 336-1280 , and follow the automated instructions; the access code is: 7215690 . The Government shall serve a copy of this order upon any person who reasonably appears to be a potential claimant to the Defendant Funds and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 3/16/2021. c/ECF (Adell, April)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property: YOU ARE, THEREFORE, HEREBY COMMANDED to maintain custody of the Defendant Funds until further order of the Court respecting the same. The United States Marshals Service (USMS) and the Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA), their authorized agents, duly designated representatives and/or contractors, shall use their discretion and whatever means appropriate to protect and maintain the Defendant Funds; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a return of this Warrant shall be promptly made to the Court identifying the individuals upon whom copies were served and the manner employed; and NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN that all persons claiming an interest in the Defendant Funds shall file their verified claim and statement of interest under penalty of perjury within thirty-five (35) days after service of the Verified Complaint or, as applicable, no later than thirty (30) days after the final date of publication of notice of the filing of the Verified Complaint, whichever is earlier, or within such additional time as the Court may allow,pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 983(a)(4) and Rule G(5) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions. In addition, any person having filed such a claim or statement of interest must also file an answer to the complaint no later than twentyone (21) days after the filing of the statement. All claims and answers must be filed with the Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722, with a copy thereof sent to Asset Forfeiture Law Clerk Beth Ann Bentley, United States Attorneys Office, Eastern District of New York, 610 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, NY 11722 or via email at bethannbentley@usdoj.gov. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (CM) Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 3/15/2021. (Cubano, Jazmin)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by United States of America (Leonardo, Diane)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against One Million, Three Hundred Ten Thousand, Nine Hundred Fifty-Nine Dollars and Zero Cents ($1,310,959.00), seized on or about November 12, 2020 in College Point, New York Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Untied States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Warrant in Rem) (Leonardo, Diane) Modified on 3/15/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/15/2021) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/15/2021) (Flanagan, Doreen).
March 15, 2021 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. The Main Document in Document Entry No. 1, as initially filed, was the Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment No. 2 was the Verified Complaint. Re-entered the Verified Complaint as the Main Document and re-entered the Civil Cover Sheet as Attachment No. 2 in Document Entry No. 1. (Flanagan, Doreen)
March 15, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
March 15, 2021 Your Proposed Summons was not issued for the following reason: The section that reads "To: (Defendant's name and address)" has not been correctly completed. The name on the Proposed Summons does not match the name as it appears on the Verified Complaint., Please correct and resubmit the Proposed Summons using the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Million, Three Hundred Ten Thousand, Nine Hundred Fifty-Nine Dollars and Zero Cents ($1,310,959.00), seized on or about November 12, 2020 in College Point, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Million, Three Hundred Ten Thousand, Nine Hundred Fifty-Nine Dollars and Zero Cents ($1,310,959.00), seized on or about November 12, 2020 in College Point, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Diane C. Leonardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?