King of Persia Corporation v. Saltz Property Management Inc. et al
Plaintiff: King of Persia Corporation
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe and Saltz Property Management Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01403
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Civil Case Terminated; Case closed. (Cubano, Jazmin)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal: The Notice to Cancel Notice of Pendency is SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 5/6/2021. (Ready, John)
May 4, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by King of Persia Corporation (Attachments: #1 Notice of Cancellation of LP, #2 Affidavit in Support of Cancellation of LP, #3 Exhibit EX A - Filed AOS) (Weinberg, Seth)
April 30, 2021 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2021. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. (Ameri, Mana)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #16 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Telephone Conference scheduled for April 30, 2021 will proceed as scheduled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/29/2021. (Ameri, Mana)
April 28, 2021 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Jane Doe has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Jane Doe is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Adjourn Conference conference is likely unnecessary because Plaintiff intends to file a motion seeking default judgment immediately by King of Persia Corporation. (Weinberg, Seth)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Certificate of Default by King of Persia Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affirmation In Support of Certificate of Default, #2 Affidavit of Service) (Weinberg, Seth)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set down for a Telephone Conference on April 30, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. Counsel is directed to utilize the Court's teleconferencing line at line at (866) 590-5055, access code 9720458, at the time of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 4/22/2021. (Ameri, Mana)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Saltz Property Management Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Saltz Property Management Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Certificate of Default by King of Persia Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affirmation In Support of Certificate of Default, #2 Ex A - Affidavit of Service) (Weinberg, Seth)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by King of Persia Corporation. John Doe served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (Weinberg, Seth)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by King of Persia Corporation. Saltz Property Management Inc. served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021. (Weinberg, Seth)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe, John Doe, Saltz Property Management Inc.. (Cubano, Jazmin)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by King of Persia Corporation (Weinberg, Seth)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by King of Persia Corporation (Weinberg, Seth)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Daniel Weinberg on behalf of King of Persia Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Weinberg, Seth)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by King of Persia Corporation (Hasbani, Rafi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Re #1 Complaint, by King of Persia Corporation (Hasbani, Rafi)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by King of Persia Corporation (Hasbani, Rafi) (Main Document 2 replaced for statistical purposes on 3/18/2021) (Florio, Lisa).
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by King of Persia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Schedule A, #2 Exhibit B- Note, #3 Exhibit C- Recorded Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D- Default Letter) (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 3/17/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).
March 17, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14284964 (Rodin, Deanna)
March 17, 2021 Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: The caption the summonses do not match the caption as it appears on the complaint. You may use "et al" and attache a rider. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 17, 2021 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Defendants were added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King of Persia Corporation v. Saltz Property Management Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saltz Property Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King of Persia Corporation
Represented By: Seth Daniel Weinberg
Represented By: Rafi Hasbani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?