Bellavia Blatt, P.C. v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bellavia Blatt, P.C.
Defendant: Nancy Baird and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01435
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of this Court's Order of April 15, 2021, DE 16, the pre-motion conference scheduled for May 10, 2021 is hereby ADJOURNED without date. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/4/2021. (Meil, Stephen)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/15/2021. (Tirado, Chelsea)
April 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bellavia Blatt, P.C. (Blatt, Steven)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #11 Letter filed by General Motors LLC. At the pre-motion conference scheduled for May 10, 2021, the parties should also be prepared to address defendant General Motors LLC's anticipated motion pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, DE 11. Plaintiff is directed to respond to DE 11 in accordance with the undersigned's individual rules by April 28, 2021.The parties are reminded that in appropriate cases, the pre-motion letter and the response, along with the parties' arguments made at the pre-motion conference, may be construed at the discretion of the Court as the motion itself. Arguments not raised in the pre-motion letters or during the pre-motion conference shall be deemed waived. See In re Best Payphones, Inc., 450 F. App'x 8, 15 (2d Cir. 2011). Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/14/2021. (Meil, Stephen)
April 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee D. Smith on behalf of General Motors LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Smith, Renee)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service of Court's Scheduling Order and Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Letter Request by Bellavia Blatt, P.C. (Blatt, Steven)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #12 : The Motion of Renee D. Smith for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/12/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (re Renee D. Smith) Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14360575. by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renee D. Smith, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Smith, Renee)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 Letter regarding Motion to Dismiss by General Motors LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) February 9, 2021 Letter from C. Corwin to B. Baird, #2 Exhibit (B) February 24, 2021 Letter from N. Baird to C. Leavitt) (Lefkowitz, Jay)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors LLC for General Motors LLC. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay P. Lefkowitz on behalf of General Motors LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lefkowitz, Jay)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re #8 Letter filed by Bellavia Blatt, P.C. A pre-motion telephone conference is scheduled for May 10, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Gary R. Brown, at which time the parties should be prepared to address plaintiff's anticipated motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, DE 8. The parties are to call (888) 363-4734 using ACCESS CODE 4132441 five minutes prior to the designated time.The parties are on notice that in appropriate cases, the pre-motion letter and the response, along with the parties' arguments made at the pre-motion conference, may be construed at the discretion of the Court as the motion itself. Arguments not raised in the pre-motion letters or during the pre-motion conference shall be deemed waived. See In re Best Payphones, Inc., 450 F. App'x 8, 15 (2d Cir. 2011).At the conference, the Court will issue a briefing schedule if necessary. Defendants are directed to respond to DE 8 in accordance with the undersigned's individual rules by April 26, 2021. In light of the Court's obligation to examine its subject matter jurisdiction sua sponte, defendant General Motors LLC is further directed to include in its response a description of the citizenship of each of its members, as limited liability companies take the citizenship of each of their members. See Bayerische Landesbank, New York Branch v. Aladdin Capital Management LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012). Before requesting an adjournment, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter with several proposed dates. The parties and other attendees to the conference are also reminded that the recording of any proceeding of the Court, including this conference, is prohibited under Local Rule 1.8.Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order and its pre-motion letter, DE 8, on defendants and file proof of service forthwith. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/9/2021. (Meil, Stephen)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 Letter Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Conference Request by Bellavia Blatt, P.C. (Blatt, Steven)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bellavia Blatt, P.C.. General Motors LLC served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Blatt, Steven)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy Baird, General Motors LLC. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Bellavia Blatt, P.C. (Blatt, Steven)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Bellavia Blatt, P.C. (Blatt, Steven)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $402, receipt number BNYEDC-14289887, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Bellavia Blatt, P.C. (Blatt, Steven) Modified on 3/18/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).
March 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellavia Blatt, P.C. v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Renee D. Smith
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellavia Blatt, P.C.
Represented By: Steven Blatt
Represented By: Leonard A Bellavia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?