Geis Construction South, LLC v. MDC Home Improvements, Inc.
Petitioner: Geis Construction South, LLC
Respondent: MDC Home Improvements, Inc.
In Re: In the matter of American Arbitration Association Arb. No. 2715
Case Number: 2:2021cv02407
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to MDC Home Improvements, Inc.. (Layne, Monique)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Petition re: Arbitration Award, by Geis Construction South, LLC (Nucifora, Christopher)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Application to Confirm Arbitration Award served on Jaime Delahunt on 6/15/2021, filed by Geis Construction South, LLC. (Nucifora, Christopher)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Pugh on behalf of Geis Construction South, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Pugh, Charles)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Evenchik on behalf of Geis Construction South, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Evenchik, Aaron)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14448498. by Geis Construction South, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Motion) (Pugh, Charles)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14448466. by Geis Construction South, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Motion) (Evenchik, Aaron)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Having reviewed Pro Hac Vice applications #7 and #8 submitted by Aaron Steven Evenchik and Charles William Pugh for Plaintiff and found them to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the applications are approved. If not already done, the attorneys shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorneys shall file notices of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notifications of activity in this case. The attorneys shall ensure that the $150 admission fee per application is submitted or has been submitted to the Clerk's Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/7/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
May 6, 2021 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Upon request, initiating documents filed as a complaint in docket entry 1 were saved, the entry deleted, and refiled as a Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MDC Home Improvements, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION re: Arbitration Award , filed by Geis Construction South, LLC. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit A MDC-GEIS Subcontract 1, #3 Exhibit B MDC-GEIS Subcontract 2, #4 Exhibit C Final Arbitration Award, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 5/6/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).
April 30, 2021 FILING FEE: $402, receipt number ANYEDC-14427031 (Rodin, Deanna)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Geis Construction South, LLC (Nucifora, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geis Construction South, LLC v. MDC Home Improvements, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Geis Construction South, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Nucifora
Represented By: Charles Pugh
Represented By: Aaron Evenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MDC Home Improvements, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In the matter of American Arbitration Association Arb. No. 2715
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?