Pichardo v. Saul
Plaintiff: Asdrubal Mariano Pichardo
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv02711
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Asdrubal Mariano Pichardo. Andrew Saul served on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (DeHaan, John)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Tankard on behalf of Andrew Saul (aty to be noticed) (Tankard, Frank)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall adhere to the attached briefing schedule: The defendant shall obtain and serve upon the plaintiff the administrative record of the proceedings, which shall constitute the defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint within ninety (90) days of commencement of this action. The plaintiff shall move for judgment on the pleadings, unless otherwise directed by the court, by service of motion papers upon the defendant within sixty (60) days of service of the administrative record upon the plaintiff. The defendant's response papers shall be served upon the plaintiff within sixty (60) days thereafter. Within twenty-one (21) days of receipt of the defendant's response (that is, by December 31, 2021), the plaintiff shall serve its reply on the defendant, and the parties shall file the entire set of motion papers, the stipulations of fact, and the administrative record with the court via ECF. The court respectfully reminds the parties that pursuant to chambers practice concerning stipulations of fact for social security motions, the parties shall confer and prepare a stipulation of facts with a chronology of medical treatment, to be filed on ECF on the date that the fully-briefed motions are due. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/18/2021. (Tran, Alexander)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #4 Summons Issued. Counsel is advised that on March 2, 2020, the Commissioner of Social Security filed a notice in the Federal Register setting forth the names and current addresses for service of process on the Commissioner in disability cases for each United States District Court. See https://www.federalregister.gov/documents/2020/03/02/2020-04246/notice-announcing-addresses-for-service-of-process. The Notice announced that service of process for the Eastern District of New York was directed to be made upon the Regional Chief Counsel's Office in Kansas City, Missouri. The Department of Justice and U.S. Attorneys Office shall be served in the manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/18/2021. (Tran, Alexander)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14472509 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Asdrubal Mariano Pichardo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (DeHaan, John) Modified on 5/17/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pichardo v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Frank D. Tankard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asdrubal Mariano Pichardo
Represented By: John W. DeHaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?