Ceaser v. Saul
Plaintiff: Warren Ceaser
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv03115
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are reminded that in Social Security cases before Judge Azrack, any motions shall be filed in accordance with this Court's individual rules, which state that "no motion papers shall be filed on ECF until the motion is fully briefed." The administrative transcript shall be filed on ECF concurrently with any fully briefed motions. After the administrative transcript has been served on Plaintiff, Defendant shall file a notice of such service on ECF. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/18/2021. (Simmons, James)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E Whelan on behalf of Andrew Saul (aty to be noticed) (Whelan, Jennifer)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons-U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons-U.S. Attorney General) (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14528580 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Warren Ceaser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Guzman, Stacey) Modified on 6/4/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceaser v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Ceaser
Represented By: Stacey Rinaldi Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Jennifer E Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?