Smith v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth N. Smith
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC and Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03205
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order(CTO 26): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Georgia for the reasons stated in the order of December 16, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Leigh Martin May. (Florio, Lisa)
June 28, 2021 Case transferred to Northern District of Georgia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
June 28, 2021 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Georgia as case 1:21-cv-02592, filed 06/28/2021. (Florio, Lisa)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order(CTO 26): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Georgia for the reasons stated in the order of December 16, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Leigh Martin May. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. (Florio, Lisa)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth N. Smith. Teva Women's Health, Inc. served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Teva Women's Health, Inc., #2 Summons Teva Women's Health, LLC, #3 Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #4 Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc., #5 Summons Coopersurgical, Inc.) (Rodin, Deanna)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 10, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14542023 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Elizabeth N. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Coopersurgical, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC, #7 Proposed Summons Teva Women's Health, LLC) (Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth N. Smith
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?