In the Matter of the Petition of Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc., as Owner, and Don Kohlhepp, as Owners
Plaintiff: Don Kohlhepp and Pines Hardware and Construction, Inc.
Petitioner: Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc.
In Re: In the Matter of the Petition of Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc., as Owner, and Don Kohlhepp, as Owners
Claimant: Nelson Gregorio Reyes Reyes and Fire Island Pines Property Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03679
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gujarati no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/20/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates that Case No. 2:21-cv-03430 (JMA)(ST) is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 8, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 8, 2021 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Replaced the Main Document in Document Entry No. 2 (Complaint) with the Notice of Filing A Complaint (initially filed as the Main Document in Document Entry No. 1). (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 8, 2021 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Added missing Claimants to the case. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Notice of Filing A Complaint (Main Document), Civil Cover Sheet, Declaration of Valuation, Proposed Order Po Tanto and Proposed Order Restraining Prosecution (Attachments). Re-entered the Complaint as the Main Document in Document Entry No. 1 (initially filed as the Main Document in Document Entry No. 2) and entered all attachments in Document Entry No. 1 as against all Claimants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability against Fire Island Pines Property Owners Association, Inc., Nelson Gregorio Reyes Reyes Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc., Don Kohlhepp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Valuation, #3 Proposed Order Po Tanto, #4 Proposed Order Restraining Prosecution) (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 7/8/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 30, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-14614029 (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION Ad Interim of Value by Don Kohlhepp, Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc. (Loh, David) Modified on 7/8/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Don Kohlhepp, Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Loh, David) Modified on 7/8/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/8/2021) (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Petition of Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc., as Owner, and Don Kohlhepp, as Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Kohlhepp
Represented By: David Yita Loh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pines Hardware and Construction, Inc.
Represented By: David Yita Loh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In the Matter of the Petition of Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc., as Owner, and Don Kohlhepp, as Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc.
Represented By: David Yita Loh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nelson Gregorio Reyes Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fire Island Pines Property Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?