Clarke v. Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marlene Clarke
Defendant: Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03762
Filed: July 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marlene Clarke. Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc. waiver sent on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Romero, Peter)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Donald Barnhorn on behalf of Marlene Clarke (aty to be noticed) (Barnhorn, David)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc.. (Landow, Concetta)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
July 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
July 7, 2021 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta)
July 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14624987 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Marlene Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Romero, Peter) Modified on 7/7/2021 (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke v. Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Clarke
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Represented By: David Donald Barnhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Senior Living Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?