BelAir Electronics, Inc. v. Velvet Caviar Group Inc
Plaintiff: BelAir Electronics, Inc.
Defendant: Velvet Caviar Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv03842
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 27 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. c/ecf Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal) (Coleman, Laurie)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #25 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs in this action. Case closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 3/4/2022. (Coleman, Laurie)
March 3, 2022 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BelAir Electronics, Inc. (Haller, Timothy)
March 2, 2022 Filing 24 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in civil action Case No. 2:22-cv-01121 (GRB)(ARL) indicates that this case is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Motion to Stay. The parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal on or before March 9, 2022. Discovery remains stayed in the interim. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 2/24/2022. (Sanders, Scott)
February 23, 2022 Filing 23 Third MOTION to Stay re #19 Scheduling Order for a Stay of Action on Consent by Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Miro, Douglas)
January 19, 2022 Filing 22 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #19 Scheduling Order for a Thirty (30) day Stay of Action on Consent by Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Miro, Douglas)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion to Stay all proceedings. In light of the parties' representing they have achieved a settlement, the conference schedule for January 20, 2022 is hereby adjourned sine die and all other dates and deadlines are stayed. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal on or before February 28, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 1/19/2022. (Wicks, James)
December 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion to Stay. The parties' joint application for a 30-day to attempt to resolve the action stay is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, the action is stayed until the next status conference which is scheduled for January 20, 2022 at 9:30 am by telephone. The parties are directed to advise the court if a settlement is achieved before that date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 12/11/2021. (Wicks, James)
December 10, 2021 Filing 21 First MOTION to Stay re #19 Scheduling Order for a Thirty (30) day Stay of Action on Consent by Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Miro, Douglas)
October 27, 2021 Conference set pursuant to 10/27/2021 Minute Order. (Ortiz, Grisel)
October 27, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Miro, Douglas)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please see order for further deadline and hearing details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 10/27/2021. (Ortiz, Grisel)
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Counsel For Plaintiff: Timothy J. Haller. Counsel For Defendant: Douglas A. Miro and Christopher Lisiewski. Video Status Conference held on 10/27/2021 at 9:00 AM. The Court adopted in-part the parties' proposed discovery schedule. Please see [DE #19 ] for the Court's scheduling order. A settlement conference has been scheduled for December 21, 2021 at 2:00 PM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. Parties shall comply with Judge Wicks' Individual Practice Rules regarding Settlement Conferences (Rules 5). A status conference has been scheduled for June 2, 2022 at 12:00 PM via the Courts AT&T Conference line. The parties should dial 1-866-434-5269 and enter access code 9025281# at the prompt. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. (FTR Log #8:58-9:05 (video).)(Ortiz, Grisel)
October 20, 2021 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by BelAir Electronics, Inc. (Haller, Timothy)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's motion to extend the time to respond to the complaint is hereby GRANTED, and the response is due on or before 10/27/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 10/8/2021. (Wicks, James)
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Miro, Douglas)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar the Initial Conference set for 10/20/2021 is hereby ADJOURNED to 10/27/2021 at 09:00 AM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/29/2021. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Protective Order Re: Confidentiality Stipulation and Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/27/2021. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 10/11/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/24/2021. (Sanders, Scott)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Protective Order by Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Miro, Douglas)
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Miro, Douglas)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The initial conference is hereby adjourned until 10/20/2021 at 11:00 am. The parties shall file their joint proposed discovery schedule on or before 10/13/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/15/2021. (Sanders, Scott)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Miro, Douglas)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 9/27/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 8/31/2021. (Sanders, Scott)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference via Zoom will be held at 3:30 am on 9/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Patent Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than 9/15/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Patent Discovery Plan Worksheet, #2 JMW Individual Rules) (Ortiz, Grisel)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by BelAir Electronics, Inc.. (Haller, Timothy)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BelAir Electronics, Inc.. Velvet Caviar Group Inc served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Haller, Timothy)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by BelAir Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Showing Non-Service at Address for Prior Summons Issued) (Haller, Timothy)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by BelAir Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Showing Non-Service at Address for Prior Summons Issued) (Haller, Timothy)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.bOrdered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/15/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Velvet Caviar Group Inc. (Landow, Concetta)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Landow, Concetta)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
July 12, 2021 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta)
July 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Velvet Caviar Group Inc filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14637490 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by BelAir Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C) (Haller, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BelAir Electronics, Inc. v. Velvet Caviar Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BelAir Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velvet Caviar Group Inc
Represented By: Douglas A. Miro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?