SBI Biotech Co., Ltd v. Creative Biolabs, Inc.
Plaintiff: SBI Biotech Co., Ltd
Defendant: Creative Biolabs, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04086
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SBI Biotech Co., Ltd. Creative Biolabs, Inc. served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (Harrison, Todd)
July 22, 2021 Attention Todd Harrison: This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Kirchner, Mary)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Creative Biolabs, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Creative Biolabs, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14676238 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by SBI Biotech Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1: copy of the 715 Patent, #4 Exhibit 2: copy of the 834 Patent, #5 Exhibit 3: home page, #6 Report On The Filing Or Determination Of An Action Regarding A Patent Or Trademark) (Harrison, Todd) Modified on 7/21/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).
July 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SBI Biotech Co., Ltd v. Creative Biolabs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBI Biotech Co., Ltd
Represented By: Todd Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Biolabs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?