Salazar et al v. Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC et al
Plaintiff: Billy Salazar and Ingrid Salazar
Defendant: Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC, Malloy Enterprises, Inc., Costellos Marine Contracting, Corp., Costello Marine Services, Inc., Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC doing business as Malloy's Waterfront Marina and Costello's Marine Contracting Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv04425
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingrid Salazar, Billy Salazar. Costello Marine Services, Inc. served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021; Costello's Marine Contracting Corporation served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021; Malloy Enterprises, Inc. served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021; Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Affidavit of Service, #5 Affidavit of Service, #6 Affidavit of Service) (Gross, Evelyn)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Consolidate by Billy Salazar, Ingrid Salazar (Gross, Evelyn)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by October 18, 2021. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) form) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 Defendants COSTELLOS MARINE CONTRACTING CORPORATION and COSTELLO MARINE SERVICES, INC. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Malloy Enterprises, Inc., Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC by Costello Marine Services, Inc., Costello's Marine Contracting Corporation. (Federici, Joseph)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malloy Enterprises, Inc. (Harris, Richard)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC (Harris, Richard)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Malloy Enterprises Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , First CROSSCLAIM against Costello Marine Services, Inc. by Malloy Enterprises, Inc.. (Harris, Richard)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Pat Malloy Waterfront ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , First CROSSCLAIM against Costello Marine Services, Inc. by Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC. (Harris, Richard)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2021: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiffs against All Defendants filing fee $402, receipt number ANYEDC-14728930, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Billy Salazar, Ingrid Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gross, Evelyn) Modified on 8/9/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar et al v. Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Salazar
Represented By: Evelyn F Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Salazar
Represented By: Evelyn F Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malloy Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costellos Marine Contracting, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costello Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Robert Federici, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Malloy Waterfront LLC doing business as Malloy's Waterfront Marina
Represented By: Richard Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costello's Marine Contracting Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Robert Federici, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?