Ebrahimzadeh v. Levy et al
Plaintiff: Atabak Ebrahimzadeh
Defendant: Avi Levy, Gad Abeckaser, David Zion, Keter 13 Capital, LLC and ATN 1 Express, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04532
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Marcia M Henry
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry for all further proceedings. Judge Gary R. Brown, Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/20/2021. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Letter Re Court Assignment & Amended Complaint by Atabak Ebrahimzadeh (Johnson, Kevin)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. For the reasons set forth in counsel's letter, the Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to a Brooklyn district judge. In addition, counsel is directed to file an amended complaint forthwith correcting the deficiencies identified in this Court's order as soon as practicable. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/17/2021. (Brown, Gary)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. Following review of the complaint herein, and in light of this Court's decision in Silverberg v. Dryships Inc., 2021 WL 2198701 (E.D.N.Y. May 28, 2021), plaintiffs' counsel is to file a letter by close of business on August 17, 2021 stating with specificity counsel's basis for representing on the cover sheet of this action that it arose in Nassau or Suffolk Counties, or whether the matter should be reassigned via random selection to a judge in Brooklyn. Secondly, review of the complaint suggests that the allegations are woefully deficient to support civil RICO counts, such that counsel should advise whether it intends to withdraw those counts or to amend to provide adequate details. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/16/2021. (Brown, Gary)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Federal RICO) against All Defendants filing fee $402, receipt number ANYEDC-14743334, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Atabak Ebrahimzadeh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Avi Levy, #3 Proposed Summons Gad Abeckaser, #4 Proposed Summons David Zion, #5 Proposed Summons Keter 13 Capital, LLC, #6 Proposed Summons ATN 1 Express, Inc.) (Johnson, Kevin) Modified on 8/13/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebrahimzadeh v. Levy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atabak Ebrahimzadeh
Represented By: Kevin Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avi Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gad Abeckaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keter 13 Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATN 1 Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?