Securities and Exchange Commission v. Battery Private, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Battery Private, Inc. and Jeffrey L. Slothower
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv04577
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
2 Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to the order to stay this case pending the resolution of United States v. Jeffrey Slothower, 21-CR-602(GRB), the conference set for 5/11/2022 in front of Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/4/2022. (Pincsak, Lydia)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #24 Motion to Intervene; granting #24 Motion to Stay. On consent, the proposed order, DE 24-2, to stay this case pending the resolution of United States v. Jeffrey Slothower, 21-CR-602(GRB) is hereby So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/24/2022. c/ecf (Tahbaz, Joseph)
February 23, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Stay by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Pitluck, David)
February 23, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David C Pitluck on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Pitluck, David)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines set; see attached order. Next Tele-Status Conference set for 5/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 1/11/2022. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
January 11, 2022 Filing 21 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/11/2022. The parties proposed discovery schedule, DE #20 , is So Ordered. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Docket Entry 13 is deemed withdrawn for failure to comply with Rule II.f of the undersigned's Individual Rules regarding the pre-motion conference requirement. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/11/2022. c/ecf (Tahbaz, Joseph)
January 6, 2022 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Securities and Exchange Commission, REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Stoelting, David)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Joan M. Azrack no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/6/2022. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 3, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Nick Oberheiden on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Oberheiden, Nick)
January 3, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Stepp on behalf of Battery Private, Inc., Jeffrey L. Slothower (aty to be noticed) (Stepp, Elizabeth)
November 17, 2021 Filing 17 Letter by Securities and Exchange Commission (Goody, Elizabeth)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Initial Conference Order dated November 10, 2021 served on Defendant Jeffrey Slothower on November 10, 2021, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Stoelting, David)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: A Tele-Initial Conference is set for 1/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Counsel for Plaintiff is instructed to serve a copy of this order on pro se defendants and electronically file proof of service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order Worksheet, #2 SIL Individual Rules) (Gandiosi, Kristin)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jeffrey L. Slothower. (Coleman, Laurie)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER dated 11/8/2021 from Jeffrey L. Slothower re In support of the answer and motion for an order to dismiss the complaint against the personal defendant. (Coleman, Laurie)
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Electronic order dated October 14, 2021 served on Jeffrey Slothower on 10/14/2021, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Stoelting, David)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #10 , Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Jeffrey L. Slothower to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended, nunc pro tunc, to and including 11/8/2021. This is the FINAL extension of time as to Defendant Slothower; no further extensions will be granted. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to serve pro se Defendant with a copy of this Electronic Order and file proof of service via ECF within three days. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 10/14/2021. (Reilly, Megan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Stoelting, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jeffrey L. Slothower. (Coleman, Laurie)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #9 , Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant Jeffrey L. Slothower to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 10/8/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/8/2021. (Reilly, Megan)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Stoelting, David)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jeffrey Slothower on August 18, 2021, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Stoelting, David)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Battery Private, Inc. on August 18, 2021, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Stoelting, David)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey L. Slothower. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Battery Private, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 16, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 16, 2021 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Paul Stoelting on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (Stoelting, David)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Reilly Goody on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (Goody, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Battery Private, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons as to Jeffrey Slothower) (Best, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Battery Private, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Elizabeth Reilly Goody
Represented By: Richard R. Best
Represented By: David Paul Stoelting
Represented By: Alison Conn
Represented By: Judith Ann Weinstock
Represented By: Lara Shalov Mehraban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Battery Private, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Stepp
Represented By: Nick Oberheiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Slothower
Represented By: Elizabeth Stepp
Represented By: Nick Oberheiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: David C Pitluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?