Umadat v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Geeta Umadat
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv04814
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Papasevastos, Maria)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference via Zoom will be held at 11:00 am on 11/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than 11/17/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Plan Worksheet, #2 JMW Individual Rules) (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's request for an extension of time within which to respond to the complaint is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before October 22, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/19/2021. (Wicks, James)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorie Elizabeth Almon on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Almon, Lorie)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Papasevastos, Maria)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Papasevastos on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Papasevastos, Maria)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Donald Barnhorn on behalf of Geeta Umadat (aty to be noticed) (Barnhorn, David)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14786015, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Geeta Umadat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Romero, Peter) Modified on 8/26/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).
August 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umadat v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geeta Umadat
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Represented By: David Donald Barnhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Lorie Elizabeth Almon
Represented By: Maria Papasevastos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?