Paper Profits, LLC v. Rob et al
Plaintiff: Paper Profits, LLC
Defendant: Mohammed Abdur Rob, Indymac Mortgage Services and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2021cv05134
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion to Reassign Case. As per counsel's motion, the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to a District Judge in the Brooklyn Division. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/21/2021. (Brown, Gary)
September 21, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano. Judge Gary R. Brown no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 Letter MOTION to Reassign Case to Brooklyn courthouse by Paper Profits, LLC. (Rodriguez, Arsenio)
September 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. Following review of the complaint herein, and in light of this Court's decision in Silverberg v. Dryships Inc., 2021 WL 2198701 (E.D.N.Y. May 28, 2021), plaintiffs' counsel is to file a letter by close of business on September 20, 2021, stating with specificity counsel's basis for representing on the cover sheet of this action that it arose in Nassau or Suffolk Counties, or whether the matter should be reassigned via random selection to a judge in Brooklyn. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/18/2021. (Brown, Gary)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
September 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Paper Profits, LLC against John Doe, Indymac Mortgage Services, Mohammed Abdur Rob filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14840887 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Paper Profits, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Schedule A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Note, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Assignments of Mortgage, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Demand Letters, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Judgment Creditors) (Rodriguez, Arsenio) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2021: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paper Profits, LLC v. Rob et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paper Profits, LLC
Represented By: Arsenio David Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Abdur Rob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?