Devitt v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas Devitt
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv05657
Filed: October 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #11 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court REPLY filed by Thomas Devitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Luisi v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, No. 2:21-cv- 05725 (E.D.N.Y. Nov. 16, 2021), #2 Exhibit Motion for Remand in Luisi v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, No. 2:21-cv- 05725 (E.D.N.Y. Nov. 16, 2021), #3 Exhibit Opposition to Motion for Remand in Luisi v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, No. 2:21-cv- 05725 (E.D.N.Y. Nov. 16, 2021), #4 Exhibit Decision in Luisi v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, No. 2:21-cv- 05725 (E.D.N.Y. Nov. 16, 2021)) (Barshay, David)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court REPLY MEMORANDUM filed by Thomas Devitt. (Barshay, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 17 Letter Requesting Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Goldstein, Philip)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Goldstein, Philip)
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Thomas Devitt SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit decision in Luisi v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, 2:21-cv- 05725 (Nov. 16, 2021)) (Barshay, David)
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in Civil Action Case No. 2:21-cv-06252 (JS)(SIL) indicates that this case is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Thomas Devitt. (Barshay, David)
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #11 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Thomas Devitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order in Williams v. Credit Corp Solutions, Inc. d/b/a/ Tasman Credit, 2:21-cv-05729-GRB-SIL (E.D.N.Y. October 26, 2021), #3 Exhibit Order in Williams v. McCarthy Burgess & Wolf, Inc.; 2:21-cv-05808-GRB-AYS (E.D.N.Y. October 28, 2021), #4 Exhibit Order in Panebianco v. Financial Recovery Services, Inc., 2:21-cv-05496-GRB-ST (E.D.N.Y. Oct. 7, 2021)) (Barshay, David)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court by Thomas Devitt. (Barshay, David)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court is in receipt of plaintiff's #11 motion to remand to state court. Defendants are directed to file a response to plaintiff's motion by November 19, 2021. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due November 29, 2021. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 11/5/2021. (Willingham, Alexandra)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in Civil Action Case No. 2:21-cv-05970 (DRH)(ST) indicates that this case is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FDCPA INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Report due by January 14, 2022. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/26/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Corsini, Alexander)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in Case No. 2:21-cv-05656 (DRH)(AYS) indicates that this civil action is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Goldstein, Philip)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Corsini, Alexander)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Corsini, Alexander)
October 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Corsini, Alexander)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet,, by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Goldstein, Philip)
October 14, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Specifically, on Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet, under the Rule 50.1(d)(2) Section, Question 2 (c) has not been completed. Because this case is a Fair Debt Collection Practices Act Case, Question 2(c) must be completed. Please resubmit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 11, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PRA Group, Inc. for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Goldstein, Philip)
October 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC from District Court of the County of Nassau, First District, case number CV-012375-21. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14920649) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Goldstein, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devitt v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Devitt
Represented By: David M. Barshay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Philip A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?