West Coast 2014-7, LLC v. Rogin et. al.
Plaintiff: West Coast 2014-7, LLC
Defendant: Steven Rogin, Michael Modica and Gregory J. Blass
Case Number: 2:2021cv05807
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. Michael Modica served on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021. (Weinreb, Alan)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service by Gregory J. Blass (Reid, Dylan)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Gregory J. Blass. (Reid, Dylan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. Gregory J. Blass served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. Steven Rogin served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 Letter advising of stay until 1/15/22 due to Defendant's COVID Hardship Declaration by West Coast 2014-7, LLC (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Hardship Declaration) (Weinreb, Alan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gregory J. Blass, Michael Modica, Steven Rogin. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by West Coast 2014-7, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b and Section Nine-X of the Banking Law by West Coast 2014-7, LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by West Coast 2014-7, LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory J. Blass, Michael Modica, Steven Rogin filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14942447 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit F, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coast 2014-7, LLC v. Rogin et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast 2014-7, LLC
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Rogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Modica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Blass
Represented By: Dylan V Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?