Crown Castle Fiber LLC v. Town of Oyster Bay et al
Plaintiff: Crown Castle Fiber LLC
Defendant: Town of Oyster Bay, Town of Oyster Bay Town Board, Town of Oyster Bay Zoning Board of Appeals, Elizabeth Maccarone and Richard Lenz
Case Number: 2:2021cv06305
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Elizabeth Maccarone, Richard Lenz, Town of Oyster Bay, Town of Oyster Bay Town Board, Town of Oyster Bay Zoning Board of Appeals. (Napolitano, Donna)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 1/22/2022. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/2/2021. (Newbill, Quenique)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for 3:30 PM on February 24, 2022 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks, in courtroom 1020. The parties are directed to complete the attached Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than February 17, 2022. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order, #2 JMW Individual Rules)(Ortiz, Grisel)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Macy on behalf of Elizabeth Maccarone, Richard Lenz, Town of Oyster Bay, Town of Oyster Bay Town Board, Town of Oyster Bay Zoning Board of Appeals (aty to be noticed) (Macy, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna A. Napolitano on behalf of Elizabeth Maccarone, Richard Lenz, Town of Oyster Bay, Town of Oyster Bay Town Board, Town of Oyster Bay Zoning Board of Appeals (aty to be noticed) (Napolitano, Donna)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. Elizabeth Maccarone served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021; Richard Lenz served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021; Town of Oyster Bay served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021; Town of Oyster Bay Town Board served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021; Town of Oyster Bay Zoning Board of Appeals served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. (Gaudioso, Robert)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Crown Castle Fiber LLC (Gaudioso, Robert)
November 16, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
November 16, 2021 SECOND NOTICE: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Specifically, Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. Please re-submit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet, this form can be found on the EDNY website. This event can be found under the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlotta Cassidy-Young on behalf of Crown Castle Fiber LLC (aty to be noticed) (Cassidy-Young, Carlotta)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Crown Castle Fiber LLC (Gaudioso, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Specifically, Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. Please re-submit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Castle Fiber LLC identifying Corporate Parent Crown Castle International Corp., Corporate Parent Crown Castle Operating Company, Corporate Parent Crown Castle Fiber Holdings Corp. for Crown Castle Fiber LLC. (Gaudioso, Robert)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Maccarone, Richard Lenz, Town of Oyster Bay, Town of Oyster Bay Town Board, Town of Oyster Bay Zoning Board of Appeals filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15025981 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gaudioso, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crown Castle Fiber LLC v. Town of Oyster Bay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crown Castle Fiber LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Gaudioso
Represented By: Carlotta Cassidy-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Oyster Bay
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Oyster Bay Town Board
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Oyster Bay Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Maccarone
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lenz
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?