Guettlein et. al. v. United States Merchant Marine Academy et. al.
Plaintiff: John Guettlein, Joshua Gardner, Alena Dunaway, Clarissa Reckline, William Tetrev and Brent LeBlanc
Defendant: United States Merchant Marine Academy, Joachim Buono, United States Maritime Administration and United States Department of Transportation
Case Number: 2:2021cv06443
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fedeal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Case closed. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/4/2022. (Coleman, Laurie)
January 3, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alena Dunaway, Joshua Gardner, John Guettlein, Brent LeBlanc, Clarissa Reckline, William Tetrev (Fonte, Mark)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying #2 Motion for Order to Show Cause - For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction or temporary restraining order is DENIED. The parties are directed to submit a proposed briefing schedule regarding Defendants' motion to dismiss by 1/4/2022. SO Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/20/2021. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Main Document 14 replaced on 12/21/2021) (Tirado, Chelsea).
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of AUSA James H. Knapp, AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of AUSA James H. Knapp filed by All Defendants. (Knapp, James)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Mikel E. Stroud, AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Mikel E. Stroud filed by All Defendants. (Knapp, James)
December 3, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Lucinda Lessley, AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Lucinda Lessley filed by All Defendants. (Knapp, James)
December 3, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Joachim Buono, AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Joachim Buono filed by All Defendants. (Knapp, James)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction , MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Knapp, James)
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Joachim Buono, United States Department of Transportation, United States Maritime Administration, United States Merchant Marine Academy. (Knapp, James)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for 2:30 PM on February 23, 2022 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks, in courtroom 1020. The parties are directed to complete the attached Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than February 16, 2022. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order, #2 JMW Individual Rules) (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order and Motion Papers served on Defendants on 11/19/2021, filed by Alena Dunaway, Joshua Gardner, John Guettlein, Brent LeBlanc, Clarissa Reckline, William Tetrev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Fonte, Mark)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Knapp on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Knapp, James)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Alena Dunaway, Joshua Gardner, John Guettlein, Brent LeBlanc, Clarissa Reckline, William Tetrev. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #2 Declaration OF LOUIS GELORMINO, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Fonte, Mark)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15045618 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Brent LeBlanc, Alena Dunaway, Joshua Gardner, John Guettlein, Clarissa Reckline, William Tetrev. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fonte, Mark) Modified on 11/19/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs are directed to serve their motion papers and this Order on the Defendants via overnight mail, and, to the extent possible, via email, and file proof of service on the docket. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of service, Defendants are directed to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order/preliminary injunction. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/19/2021. (Walsh, Catherine)
November 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guettlein et. al. v. United States Merchant Marine Academy et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Guettlein
Represented By: Louis M Gelormino
Represented By: Mark J. Fonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Gardner
Represented By: Louis M Gelormino
Represented By: Mark J. Fonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alena Dunaway
Represented By: Louis M Gelormino
Represented By: Mark J. Fonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa Reckline
Represented By: Louis M Gelormino
Represented By: Mark J. Fonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tetrev
Represented By: Louis M Gelormino
Represented By: Mark J. Fonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent LeBlanc
Represented By: Louis M Gelormino
Represented By: Mark J. Fonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Merchant Marine Academy
Represented By: James H. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joachim Buono
Represented By: James H. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Maritime Administration
Represented By: James H. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation
Represented By: James H. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?